Cordova v. City Of New York et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | P Kevin Castel |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02633 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 12:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
City Of New York
|
|
Defendant
Michael Figueroa
|
|
Defendant
Neil O'Donnell
|
|
Defendant
Emmanuel Valerio
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Cordova
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 04/11 3:26 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/11/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: 1-888-363-4749 Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/11/2024) (vfr) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 3:05 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Neil O'Donnell(in his official capacity), Neil O'Donnell(individually)..(pc) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 3:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emmanuel Valerio(individually), Emmanuel Valerio(in his official capacity)..(pc) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 3:01 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Figueroa(individually), Michael Figueroa(in his official capacity)..(pc) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 1:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Neil O'Donnell, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kevin Cordova..(Joubin, Cyrus) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 1:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emmanuel Valerio, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kevin Cordova..(Joubin, Cyrus) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 1:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Figueroa, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kevin Cordova..(Joubin, Cyrus) |
|
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service Complaints
Wed 04/10 1:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. City Of New York served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. Document filed by Kevin Cordova..(Joubin, Cyrus) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 12:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York..(jgo) |
|
adr
Notice of Participation in Section 1983 Plan
Tue 04/09 10:50 AM
NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 12:41 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 12:42 PM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 12:42 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 11:39 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kevin Cordova..(Joubin, Cyrus) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 11:38 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Joubin, Cyrus) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 11:37 AM
COMPLAINT against City Of New York, Michael Figueroa(individually), Michael Figueroa(in his official capacity), Neil O'Donnell(in his official capacity), Neil O'Donnell(individually), Emmanuel Valerio(individually), Emmanuel Valerio(in his official capacity). (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29186996)Document filed by Kevin Cordova..(Joubin, Cyrus) |