SCULLEN v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Lanzillo |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00522 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/26 9:20 AM
ORDER granting1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL SCULLEN. Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED to the extent that the case may proceed without the prepayment of the entire filing fee and the Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Plaintiff is advised that no further action will be taken in this case until the initial partial fee of $22.38 is paid in full, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 4/26/2024. (cmc) |
|
6 | 6
order
Standing Practice Order for Pro Se Civil Rights Cases
Fri 04/26 8:56 AM
STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 4/26/2024. (cmc) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/26 10:57 AM
This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo pursuant to Administrative Order 2024-03 filed at 2:24-mc-10001. Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer assigned to case. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Fri 04/26 11:59 AM
COMPLAINT against ERIC T. ARMEL, JASON COOK, LISA DUNCAN, TIFFANY FACKLER, REGINA GRAFT, ROBERT HAWKINBERRY, HARRY LAUREL, GEORGE LITTLE, CHRISTOPHER OPPMAN, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, SCOTT RIDDLE, PETER SAAVEDRA, JOSEPH TREMPUS, TINA WALKER, TREVOR WINGARD ), filed by MICHAEL SCULLEN. (sdp) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/17 1:21 PM
Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy added - related case at 2:22-cv-1516. Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly no longer assigned to case. (sms) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 04/09 9:53 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by MICHAEL SCULLEN. (sdp) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
4 | 4
misc
Authorization by Prisoner
Tue 04/09 9:52 AM
Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by MICHAEL SCULLEN. (sdp) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Exhibits in Support
Tue 04/09 9:50 AM
EXHIBITS in Support by MICHAEL SCULLEN. (sdp) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 23, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 24, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 25, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 26, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 28, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 29 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Exhibits in Support
Tue 04/09 9:36 AM
EXHIBITS in Support by MICHAEL SCULLEN. (sdp) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 21 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/08 4:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL SCULLEN. (sdp) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 04/09 9:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (sdp) |