Bango, Noel v. Florida Department of Corrections
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Melissa Damian |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80424 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Fri 04/12 3:51 PM
ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE1 PETITION AND CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 4/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Mon 04/08 12:18 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian (kma) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 04/08 12:11 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Filing fee not paid/ IFP Motion not filed), filed by Noel K. Bango.(kma) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law |