Lopez v. Mizmor 91 LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer H Rearden |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02635 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Kabbo Pizza and Fried Chiken Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mizmor 91 LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Lopez
Barducci Law Firm PLLC 5 West 19 Street 10th Floor
New York, NY 10011 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 12:39 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Kabbo Pizza and Fried Chiken Inc served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Samuel Lopez..(Barducci, Maria Costanza) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 12:35 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Mizmor 91 LLC served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Samuel Lopez..(Barducci, Maria Costanza) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 3:41 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mizmor 91 LLC..(pc) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 3:40 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kabbo Pizza and Fried Chiken Inc..(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 11:11 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 11:12 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 11:12 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 12:14 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kabbo Pizza and Fried Chiken Inc, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Samuel Lopez..(Barducci, Maria Costanza) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 12:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mizmor 91 LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Samuel Lopez..(Barducci, Maria Costanza) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 12:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barducci, Maria Costanza) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 12:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Kabbo Pizza and Fried Chiken Inc, Mizmor 91 LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29187327)Document filed by Samuel Lopez..(Barducci, Maria Costanza) |