City Merchandise Inc. v. Everbright Trading Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | P Kevin Castel |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02636 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Everbright Trading Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City Merchandise Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 04/26 2:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Everbright Trading Inc. served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. Service was accepted by Daniel Chen, authorized agent. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc...(Toptani, Edward) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 4:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Everbright Trading Inc...(jgo) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 11:56 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Everbright Trading Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc...(Toptani, Edward) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 04/11 3:34 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/27/2024 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: 1-888-363-4749 Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/11/2024) (vfr) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 2:51 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Edward G. Toptani to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the attorney information was omitted;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Tue 04/09 3:50 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/09 1:38 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Everbright Trading Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc...(Toptani, Edward) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 11:20 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 11:20 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 11:20 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 12:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward G. Toptani on behalf of City Merchandise Inc...(Toptani, Edward) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 12:47 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc...(Toptani, Edward) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 12:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Toptani, Edward) |
|
2 | 2
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Mon 04/08 12:42 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Toptani, Edward) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 12:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Everbright Trading Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29187667)Document filed by City Merchandise Inc...(Toptani, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit Ex.1 [Product Comparisons], | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex.2 [Copyright] |