PERROTTE v. O'MALLEY
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan N Bloch |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00523 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405(g) Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Quinn Niblack-Doggett on behalf of MARTIN O'MALLEY. (Niblack-Doggett, Quinn) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 04/10 9:52 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan N. Bloch for all further proceedings. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/10/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 3:30 PM
Summons Issued as to MARTIN O'MALLEY (bjr) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
3 | 3
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Tue 04/09 2:51 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by Gary Perrotte (Sinko, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
2 | 2
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Tue 04/09 11:38 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by Gary Perrotte (Sinko, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 04/09 8:40 AM
Judge Joy Flowers Conti added. (bjr) |
||
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Tue 04/09 8:43 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Summons are missing attorney contact information. CORRECTION: File a praecipe to issue summons with corrections. (bjr) |
||
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Tue 04/09 1:37 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re2 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: No Praecipe filed. CORRECTION: File a Praecipe as the main document and all summons to issue as attachments. (bjr) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Mon 04/08 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT against MARTIN O'MALLEY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8204474), filed by Gary Perrotte. (Sinko, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Tue 04/09 8:44 AM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from MARTIN O'MALLEY on 6/8/2024 (bjr) |