Roland v. Booth et al
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | David L Bunning |
Referred: | Candace J Smith |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00050 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Savannah J Booth
|
|
Defendant
William Booth
|
|
Defendant
Allison Brinkhaus
|
|
Plaintiff
Susan Roland
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/08 1:17 PM
STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011. (TBB)cc: COR Modified on 4/8/2024 (TBB) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued/Reissued
Mon 04/08 1:07 PM
Summons in a Civil Action Issued as to William Booth and returned to counsel electronically for service. (TBB) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued/Reissued
Mon 04/08 1:06 PM
Summons in a Civil Action Issued as to Allison Brinkhaus and returned to counsel electronically for service. (TBB) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued/Reissued
Mon 04/08 1:05 PM
Summons in a Civil Action Issued as to Savannah J Booth and returned to counsel electronically for service. (TBB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 12:56 PM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5809897), filed by Susan Roland.(TBB) (TBB) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 (4/8/2024) Summons Savannah Booth, | ||
Att: 3 (4/8/2024) Summons Allison Brinkhaus, | ||
Att: 4 (4/8/2024) Summons William Booth | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Mon 04/08 12:57 PM
Conflict Check run. (TBB) |
||
notice
Notice for Attorney to Update Address
Mon 04/08 2:12 PM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS AND EMAIL to Gregory A. Keyser: It appears the address listed on your filing1 Complaint, is different than the address registered with our Court. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (TBB) |