ABC v. DEF
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edgardo Ramos |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-00172 |
Cause | M 98 Miscellaneous Application to File Civil Case Under Seal |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal
Wed 04/10 11:12 AM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** ORDER TO FILE ACTION UNDER SEAL granting1 Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal. Cases sought to be filed under seal for which permission is granted must not be initiated electronically and must be submitted in the traditional manner, on paper. Please see Section 14.2 of the ECF Rules and Instructions.[LINK:ECF RULES & INSTRUCTIONS] . The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to restrict access to this order to the "selected party" viewing level and to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/9/2024) (jca) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 9:21 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vba) |
||
notice
Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 9:22 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. This is a Part I Term Assignment matter. (vba) |
||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal
Tue 04/09 9:23 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CASE UNDER SEAL. Document No. 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal . was reviewed and approved as to form. (vba) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 04/09 9:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Carolina A. Fornos. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ABC; DEF. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vba) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Miscellaneous Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 2:14 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Fornos, Carolina) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Leave to File Case Under Seal
Mon 04/08 2:11 PM
***EX-PARTE*** MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal .Document filed by ABC.(Fornos, Carolina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to File Action Under Seal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Carolina A. Fornos in Support of Motion to File Action Under Seal, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Motion to Quash, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Quash, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Declaration of Carolina A. Fornos in Support of Motion to Quash, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit A grand jury subpoena, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit B grand jury subpoena, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit C correspondence to SDNY, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit D CBS news article, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit E NY Post news article, | ||
Att: 13 Errata F NY Post news article, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit G ABC news article, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit H News Nation Now news article, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit I -The Source news article, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 7.1 Disclosure Statement |