LightGuide, Inc. v. Arkite NV
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Glenn T Suddaby |
Referred: | Therese Wiley Dancks |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00482 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:1 Establishment of PTO |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Arkite NV
|
|
Plaintiff
LightGuide, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
utility
Patent/Trademark Report
Thu 05/02 4:32 PM
Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 7,515,981 and 9,658,614. (sal ) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 05/01 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by LightGuide, Inc. (Sullivan, Denis) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 10:42 AM
TEXT ORDER granting9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karl Ondersma. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/22/2024. (sg) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 10:40 AM
TEXT ORDER granting8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Terence Linn. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/22/2024. (sg) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 2:25 PM
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karl T. Ondersma Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6698427. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Sullivan, Denis) |
|
Att: 1 Petition for Admission, | ||
Att: 2 E-Filing Registration Form, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Sponsor | ||
8 | 8
motion
Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 2:18 PM
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Terence J. Linn Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6698231. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Sullivan, Denis) |
|
Att: 1 Petition for Admission, | ||
Att: 2 E-Filing Registration Form, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Sponsor | ||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 11:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Arkite NV. (hmr) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 1:04 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LightGuide, Inc.. (Sullivan, Denis) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons(es)
Mon 04/08 1:03 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): LightGuide, Inc. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Arkite NV (Sullivan, Denis) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Admission Requirement
Mon 04/08 12:24 PM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Karl T. Ondersma, Email address is ondersma@gardner-linn.com. Phone number is 616-975-5500. Attorney Terence J. Linn, Email address is linn@gardner-linn.com. Phone number is 616-975-5500. [Copy of Notice was emailed to both Attorney Ondersma and Attorney Linn, along with a courtesy copy of the General Order #25 on 4/8/2024.] Admissions due by 4/22/2024. (hmr) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/8/2024) (hmr, ) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Patent/Trademark Report
Mon 04/08 12:17 PM
Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 7,515,981, 9,658,614. (hmr) |
|
2 | 2
misc
G.O. 25 Filing Order
Mon 04/08 12:02 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/8/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/1/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) [Courtesy copy of the GO #25 was emailed to Attorney Ondersma and Attorney Linn on 4/8/2024.](hmr) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Arkite NV (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6686458) filed by LightGuide, Inc.(hmr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 981 Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 614 Patent, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Text Notice of Filing Deficiency
Mon 04/08 12:32 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to LightGuide, Inc. regarding the1 Complaint NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summons(es) were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 4/11/2024 (hmr) |
||
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Mon 04/08 12:43 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re4 Notice of Admission Requirement: Clerk replaced this document with a corrected document which contained the full address, including the city, state and zip code. (hmr) |