Rodriguez v. Synergetic Communication, Inc.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21298 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 3:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
Synergetic Communication, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 04/12 11:13 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Michael Rodriguez. Synergetic Communication, Inc. served on 4/11/2024, response/answer due 5/2/2024.(Bavaro, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Thu 04/11 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/11/2024. (aci) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 3:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Synergetic Communication, Inc.. (cds) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/08 3:42 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Synergetic Communication, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17430433, filed by Michael Rodriguez.(Bavaro, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) Proposed Summons |