Molina v. Wipro Limited Corp
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Aileen M Cannon |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-14103 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 3:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
Wipro Limited Corp
|
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Molina
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 4:00 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Wipro Limited Corp (Andrews, Nicholas) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions
Mon 04/29 3:56 PM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Wipro Limited Corp (Andrews, Nicholas) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/29 3:52 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Wipro Limited Corp. Attorney Nicholas S Andrews added to party Wipro Limited Corp(pty:dft). (Andrews, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/10 10:17 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Oscar Molina. Wipro Limited Corp served on 4/9/2024, response/answer due 4/30/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/08 3:43 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Oscar Molina (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 3:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Wipro Limited Corp. (drz) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/08 3:09 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Wipro Limited Corp. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17430123, filed by Oscar Molina.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |