Whitaker et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel D Crabtree |
Referred: | Gwynne E Birzer |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02132 |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgemen |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, 24CV00870 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 2:09 PM CDT |
Defendant
Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Royal Whitaker, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Whitaker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Statement
Fri 04/26 6:32 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION STATEMENT Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) by Plaintiffs Royal Whitaker, III, Susan Whitaker. (Vokins, Tai) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/15 2:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(O'Malley, Michele) |
|
11 | 11
8
pgs
support
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 04/15 2:06 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Royal Whitaker, III, Susan Whitaker(Vokins, Tai) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
10 | 10
motion
Remand to State Court
Mon 04/15 2:05 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Royal Whitaker, III, Susan Whitaker (Vokins, Tai) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
State Court Records
Thu 04/11 11:33 AM
STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas.(O'Malley, Michele) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1-B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1-C | ||
8 | 8
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Statement
Thu 04/11 10:32 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION STATEMENT by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (O'Malley, Michele) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Designation of Place of Trial
Thu 04/11 10:05 AM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (O'Malley, Michele) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/08 12:16 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Othmer on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Othmer, Aaron) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/08 11:59 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michele M. O'Malley on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (O'Malley, Michele) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 11:55 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. identifying SP Holding Enterprises Corp. as corporate parent . (O'Malley, Michele) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Intent to Remove
Mon 04/08 11:50 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT TO REMOVE by Michele M. O'Malley on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (O'Malley, Michele) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 11:25 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (O'Malley, Michele) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/08 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 24CV00870 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6318036.), filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (O'Malley, Michele) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 04/08 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jsh) |