Coon v. Trans Am Financial Services
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel D Crabtree |
Referred: | Rachel E Schwartz |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-04025 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 2:09 PM CDT |
Defendant
Trans Am Financial Services
|
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Coon
1705 28th Street W
Williston, ND 58801 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Order
Tue 04/30 8:22 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice8 Plaintiff's Motion to Terminate Contract. Plaintiff's Motion requests a court order directing Defendant to immediately terminate its contract with Plaintiff. However, Defendant has not yet been served because the Court is still addressing the issue of whether Plaintiff is entitled to proceed with a lawsuit in federal court without prepayment of fees. The Court notes that Plaintiff recently filed7 Objections to the pending4 Report and Recommendation, which recommends that the District Judge deny the motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees. Given the procedural state of the case, the Court denies the Motion without prejudice to refiling at a later stage, if appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 4/30/2024. A copy of this order was mailed to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
motion
Order
Fri 04/26 4:49 PM
MOTION to Terminate Contract by Plaintiff Christopher Coon . (mls) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
7 | 7
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 04/26 4:32 PM
OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Christopher Coon. (mls) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Designation of Place of Trial
Fri 04/26 4:22 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Christopher Coon - trial to be held in Kansas City. (mls) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/26 3:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Christopher Coon. (mls) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 04/11 12:00 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy) filed by Christopher Coon. The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Judge deny the Application and direct Plaintiff to pay the filing fee within thirty days of an order on this Report and Recommendation. The Magistrate Judge further recommends that the District Judge caution Plaintiff that failure to pay the filing fee by the deadline will likely result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on April 11, 2024. Mailed to pro se party Christopher Coon by regular mail. (mls) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 04/08 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing and Civil cover sheet is missing. The filing party is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. Mailed to Christopher Coon 1705 28th Street W Williston, ND 58801 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (nac) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/08 2:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher Coon. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (nac) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Christopher Coon.(nac) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 04/08 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac) |