Nevada District Court
Judge:Nancy J Koppe
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:24-cv-00680
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 6:21 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
CC Technology Corporation
Represented By
David B. Barney
Sklar Williams PLLC
contact info
Stephen R. Hackett
Sklar Williams PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Capital Pure Assets, Ltd
Represented By
Kyle Fenton
Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright
contact info
G. Mark Albright
Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright
contact info
Counter Defendant
James P. Chrisman
Represented By
Kyle Fenton
Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright
contact info
G. Mark Albright
Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright
contact info
Counter Defendant
Chrisman, P.C.
Represented By
Kyle Fenton
Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright
contact info
G. Mark Albright
Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright
contact info
Counter Defendant
Hannah Dawn Prakash
Represented By
Kyle Fenton
Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright
contact info
G. Mark Albright
Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright
contact info
Counter Defendant
Shiva Prakash
Represented By
Kyle Fenton
Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright
contact info
G. Mark Albright
Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright
contact info
Counter Defendant
Vikhyat Prakash
Represented By
G. Mark Albright
Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright
contact info
Defendant
CC Technology Corporation
Represented By
David B. Barney
Sklar Williams PLLC
contact info
Stephen R. Hackett
Sklar Williams PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Capital Pure Assets, Ltd.
Represented By
Kyle Fenton
Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright
contact info
Eric D. Walther
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
contact info
G. Mark Albright
Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright
contact info
Mitchell J. Langberg
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
79 79 motion Motion Enforce Fri 05/09 6:31 PM
Third MOTION to Enforce Settlement and for Order Entering Confession of Judgment re75 Order,,,,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Defendant CC Technology Corporation. Responses due by 5/23/2025.(Barney, David) (MJorder)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Robert Lang,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of David B. Barney, Esq.,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Default,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Completed Confession of Judgment
78 78 motion Motion Enforce Fri 05/09 4:09 PM
MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Capital Pure Assets, Ltd., Counter Defendants Shiva Prakash, Capital Pure Assets, Ltd, Hannah Dawn Prakash, Vikhyat Prakash, Chrisman, P.C., James P. Chrisman. Responses due by 5/23/2025.(Tueller, Piers) (Settlement)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Piers R. Tueller, Esq.
Thursday, May 08, 2025
77 77 motion Motion Sanctions Thu 05/08 10:05 PM
MOTION for Sanctions Motion to Calculate Sanctions re62 Order on Motion to Enforce,,,,, by Defendant CC Technology Corporation. (DJorder) Responses due by 5/22/2025.(Barney, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of David B. Barney, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Billing History
Monday, May 05, 2025
76 76 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 05/06 11:04 AM
ORDER Granting73 Stipulation to Amend Order Releasing Funds in Court Registry (ECF No.72 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF. CC: Finance. - RJDG)
Related: [-]
75 75 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/05 10:43 AM
ORDER. On April 29, 2025, the Court held Counter-Defendants in contempt for failing to make the $14,000 initial payment as ordered. Docket No.72 at 4-5; see also Docket No. 71 . Pending before the Court now is Counter-Defendants' notice of compliance that the $14,000 initial payment was made later that same day, April 29, 2025. Docket No.74 . In light of that notice, Counter-Defendants' contempt has been purged, no fines will be assessed, and the status conference set for May 6, 2025, is vacated. It appears the case may now be primed for dismissal, see Docket No.57 -2 at 2(b), but the Court understands the parties may dispute whether jurisdiction should be retained after dismissal. Counsel must promptly confer on these issues. Either a stipulation of dismissal or simultaneous counter-motion practice must be filed on May 9, 2025. Brief due by 5/9/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
74 74 notice Notice Other Fri 05/02 7:57 PM
NOTICE Notice of Compliance by Capital Pure Assets, Ltd.. (Tueller, Piers)
Related: [-]
73 73 motion Stipulation Fri 05/02 4:58 PM
STIPULATION and Order to Amend Order Releasing Funds in Court Registry re72 Order, by Defendant CC Technology Corporation. (Barney, David) (other) (presiding)
Related: [-]