Trustees of the Laborers' International Union of North America Local 235 Fringe Benefit Funds et al v. Jenco Contracting Corp.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip M Halpern |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02641 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.: Delinquent Contributions |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 3:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Jenco Contracting Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Laborers' International Union of North America Local 235
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Laborers' International Union of North America Local 235 Fringe Benefit Funds
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/11 9:14 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Jenco Contracting Corp. served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. Document filed by Trustees of the Laborers' International Union of North America Local 235 Fringe Benefit Funds; Laborers' International Union of North America Local 235..(Harari, Michele) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 3:47 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jenco Contracting Corp...(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 11:48 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 11:48 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 11:49 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 2:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jenco Contracting Corp., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Laborers' International Union of North America Local 235, Trustees of the Laborers' International Union of North America Local 235 Fringe Benefit Funds..(Harari, Michele) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 2:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Harari, Michele) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 2:25 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Laborers' International Union of North America Local 235, Trustees of the Laborers' International Union of North America Local 235 Fringe Benefit Funds..(Harari, Michele) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Jenco Contracting Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29188705)Document filed by Trustees of the Laborers' International Union of North America Local 235 Fringe Benefit Funds, Laborers' International Union of North America Local 235..(Harari, Michele) |