ChemImage Corporation v. Johnson & Johnson et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02646 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 4:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Ethicon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
ChemImage Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Redacted Document
Mon 04/29 5:12 PM
REDACTION (Complaint) per 04/29/2024 Order by ChemImage Corporation.(Spiro, Alex) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - ChemImage-Ethicon Agreement | ||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Mon 04/29 11:35 AM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion to Seal; terminating15 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application GRANTED. Based on a review of the proposed redactions in the Complaint and its attachment, see ECF Nos. 15-1, 15-2, 15-3, 15-4, the Court finds that the proposed redactions are narrowly tailored to further interests that are sufficient to outweigh the presumption in favor of public access. Accordingly, the application is granted, subject to reconsideration in the event that any party or third party files a motion to unseal a particular document or documents. Plaintiff shall file the redacted version of the Complaint and its attachment on the public docket within two business days. The Clerk of Court is directed to place ECF No. 1 under seal (i.e., with viewing restricted to the Court and parties), and to terminate ECF Nos. 14 and 15. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/26/2024) (mml) Modified on 4/29/2024 (mml) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 04/26 12:46 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Documents in Redacted Form and Strike or Seal Previously Filed Documents addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Courtney C. Whang dated April 26, 2024. Document filed by ChemImage Corporation, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:14 .(Whang, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Sealed Complaint comparison, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Ex. A to Sealed Complaint comparison, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Proposed permanent public version of Complaint with redactions, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Proposed permanent public version of Ex. A to Complaint with redactions | ||
14 | 14
motion
Seal
Fri 04/26 12:34 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Courtney C. Whang dated April 26, 2024. Document filed by ChemImage Corporation..(Whang, Courtney) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Certificate of Service Other
Mon 04/15 10:36 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases served on Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. on April 12, 2024. Service was made by Email. Document filed by ChemImage Corporation..(Whang, Courtney) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 04/12 7:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ethicon, Inc. served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. Service was accepted by Aurora Kochersperger - Intake Specialist. Document filed by ChemImage Corporation..(Spiro, Alex) |
|
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 04/12 6:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Johnson & Johnson served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. Service was accepted by Aurora Kochersperger - Intake Specialist. Document filed by ChemImage Corporation..(Spiro, Alex) |
|
10 | 10
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Fri 04/12 6:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Ethicon, Inc. on April 11, 2024. Service was accepted by Aurora Kochersperger - Intake Specialist. Document filed by ChemImage Corporation..(Spiro, Alex) |
|
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Fri 04/12 6:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Johnson & Johnson on April 11, 2024. Service was accepted by Aurora Kochersperger - Intake Specialist. Document filed by ChemImage Corporation..(Spiro, Alex) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 04/11 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on May 22, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 3.D of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 5/22/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/11/24) (yv) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 11:37 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent DBM Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate Cardiovere, LLC, Other Affiliate ChemImage BioMedical, LLC, Other Affiliate ChemImage BioThreat, LLC, Other Affiliate ChemImage Filter Technologies, LLC, Other Affiliate ChemImage Forensics, LLC, Other Affiliate ChemImage Technologies, LLC, Other Affiliate Innotescus, LLC for ChemImage Corporation. Document filed by ChemImage Corporation..(Spiro, Alex) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew J. Rossman on behalf of ChemImage Corporation..(Rossman, Andrew) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Courtney Christine Whang on behalf of ChemImage Corporation..(Whang, Courtney) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 10:43 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex Spiro on behalf of ChemImage Corporation..(Spiro, Alex) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
misc
Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF
Tue 04/09 10:39 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Courtney Christine Whang for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 1 Complaint, 2 Civil Cover Sheet to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (pc) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Sealed Document
Mon 04/08 4:05 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 3:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(pc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number 28115)Document filed by ChemImage Corporation..(pc) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 3:57 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc...(pc) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 3:58 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Johnson & Johnson..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/08 3:58 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 3:59 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Remark
Mon 04/08 3:59 PM
ORDER REDACTING PLEADING FILED IN 24MC168. Document filed by ChemImage Corporation..(pc) |