Sewell v. Frankhouser et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | David S Cercone |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00525 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Allegheny Court of Common Pleas, GD-24-002621 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 4:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
Nicole Frankhouser
7604 Charleston Ave
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lee Morris
7604 Charleston Ave
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Francine Vandenburg
7604 Charleston Ave
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Latika Sewell
2221 Hawthorne Ave
Swissvale, PA 15218 |
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 4:13 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Gregory S. Hyman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 4/25/2024. (lyk) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
Wed 04/24 7:58 PM
MOTION for attorney Gregory S. Hyman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8234149) by Nicole Frankhouser, Lee Morris, Francine Vandenburg. (Hyman, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/22 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Rafferty on behalf of Nicole Frankhouser, Lee Morris, Francine Vandenburg. (Rafferty, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Response/Briefing Schedule
Tue 04/16 3:25 PM
ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Plaintiff's response and brief in opposition shall be filed on or before Friday, May 17, 2024. Defendants may file any reply brief on or before Friday, May 31, 2024. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions, which could include the dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 4/16/2024. (lyk) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Mon 04/15 3:49 PM
BRIEF in Support re3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nicole Frankhouser, Lee Morris, Francine Vandenburg. (Hyman, Gregory) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 04/15 3:47 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Nicole Frankhouser, Lee Morris, Francine Vandenburg. (Hyman, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/10 12:22 PM
Judge David S. Cercone added as Presider. (njd) |
||
misc
QC - Attorney Signature Deficient
Wed 04/10 12:29 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re2 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Attorney signature missing BAR ID number, State Abbreviation and Email. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (njd) |
||
misc
QC - Proposed Order part of main document
Wed 04/10 12:30 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re2 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (njd) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 04/09 10:50 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Nicole Frankhouser, Lee Morris, Francine Vandenburg. (Hyman, Gregory) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required)
Mon 04/08 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas, case number GD-24-002621. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8204537), filed by Nicole Frankhouser, Francine Vandenburg, Lee Morris. (Hyman, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet |