Herrera v. Crocs Retail, LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roy K Altman |
Referred: | Eduardo I Sanchez |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21304 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Crocs Retail, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Herrera
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 04/19 11:10 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Oscar Herrera. Crocs Retail, LLC served on 4/16/2024, response/answer due 5/7/2024. (Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit
Tue 04/16 12:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT signed by: OSCAR HERRERA re4 Order, by Oscar Herrera (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Wed 04/10 12:54 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re4 Order, (Verified Certificate of Prior ADA Filings) by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Oscar Herrera (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 04/09 4:35 PM
ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT AND VERIFIED AFFIDAVIT REGARDING VISITS TO PROPERTY. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a verified response to this Order by April 16, 2024. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/9/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Crocs Retail, LLC. (caw) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 04/09 10:44 AM
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Crocs Retail, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17431193, filed by Oscar Herrera.(Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) |