Taian Insurance Co., Ltd. v. Bondex Logistics Co., Ltd.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale E Ho |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02650 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333ad Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Bondex Logistics Co., Ltd.
|
|
Plaintiff
Taian Insurance Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 9:51 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Bondex Logistics Co., Ltd. served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. Service was accepted by James E. Devine (Agent) c/o John Doe (Security Guard). Document filed by Taian Insurance Co., Ltd...(Heilig, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 04/10 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on May 29, 2024, at 3:30 P.M. EST. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 874 393 008, followed by the pound (#) sign. Initial Conference set for 5/29/2024 at 03:30 PM before Judge Dale E. Ho. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 4/10/2024) (ate) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 3:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bondex Logistics Co., Ltd...(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 2:03 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 2:04 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 2:05 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 4:16 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bondex Logistics Co., Ltd., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Taian Insurance Co., Ltd...(Heilig, Justin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 4:11 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Taian Insurance Co., Ltd...(Heilig, Justin) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 4:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Bondex Logistics Co., Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29189717)Document filed by Taian Insurance Co., Ltd...(Heilig, Justin) |