New York Southern District Court
Judge:Dale E Ho
Referred: Gary Stein
Case #: 1:24-cv-02658
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Terminated:Sep 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 8:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Laurie Labesque
Represented By
Michael Emanuel DeLarco
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Zachary Phillip Siegel
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sergio Massanas
Defendant
PUIG USA, INC.
Represented By
Michael Emanuel DeLarco
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Zachary Phillip Siegel
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aisha Rosenfeld
Represented By
Jerome Noll
Marzec Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Darius Adam Marzec
Marzec Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
38 38 order Memo Endorsement Wed 09/04 12:02 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:37 Letter filed by Aisha Rosenfeld ENDORSEMENT: Where FLSA is implicated, "district court[s] properly inquire[] as to the existence of any FLSA settlement," even where parties purport to have dismissed a case. See Samake v. Thunder Lube, Inc., 24 F.4th 804, 809 (2d Cir. 2022) (citations omitted). In light of the parties' representation herein that no FLSA settlement was implicated, this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, as stipulated by the parties at ECF Nos. 32-35. SO ORDERED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to close this case. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 9/3/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/29 9:29 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 36 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Dale E. Ho for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) case. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
37 37 misc Letter Wed 08/28 2:30 PM
SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Jerome Noll, Esq. dated 08/28/2024 re: Stipulation of Dismissal. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld..(Noll, Jerome)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/28 1:36 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Laurie Labesque, Sergio Massanas, PUIG USA, INC. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Noll, Jerome)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/28 8:16 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Jerome Noll. RE-FILE Document No. 32 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/28 8:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Jerome Noll. RE-FILE Document No. 33 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/28 8:21 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Dale E. Ho for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) case. (tp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/27 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Sergio Massanas. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Noll, Jerome)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/27 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Sergio Massanas. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Noll, Jerome)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/27 3:38 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Laurie Labesque, PUIG USA, INC. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Noll, Jerome)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/27 1:52 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Laurie Labesque, Sergio Massanas, PUIG USA, INC. and without costs. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Noll, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order Mon 08/26 3:53 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is ordered to file a letter on ECF by September 3, 2024, 1) explaining why Cheeks does not apply, notwithstanding that Plaintiff expressly raised an FLSA claim, see ECF No. 1; or 2) providing Second Circuit authority for the proposition that Plaintiff's FLSA claim need not be approved by the Court in these circumstances. Plaintiff is further directed to respond to Judge Stein's order requiring Plaintiff to 3) explain whether Plaintiff intends to prosecute this case further against Defendant Massanas via default judgment proceedings. The Court's order requiring submission by September 2, 2024, of the parties' settlement agreement is hereby ADJOURNED sine die, pending resolution of the above-mentioned issues. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 8/26/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
30 30 misc Letter Fri 08/23 4:03 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Jerome Noll, Esq. dated 08/23/2024 re: Request to Enter Order. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld..(Noll, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/19 12:16 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before September 2, 2024, the parties must submit the settlement agreement to the Court along with a joint letter explaining the basis for the proposed settlement and why, if parties contemplate dismissal under Rule 41, it should be approved as fair and reasonable, with reference to the factors discussed in Wolinsky. See Wolinsky, 900 F. Supp. 2d at 335-36. The letter should also address, if applicable, any incentive payments to the plaintiff and any attorney's fee award to plaintiff's counsel (with documentation to support the latter, if appropriate). As further set forth by this Order. All pending deadlines in this case, are adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 8/19/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 08/19 12:07 PM
ORDER: According to a report filed by a mediator associated with this District's Mediation Program, as of July 16, 2024, a mediation had been held in this matter "and agreement was reached on all issues." (Dkt. No. 27). The docket further reflects that Defendant Sergio Massanas is the only non-appearing Defendant in this matter. Accordingly, the appearing parties are directed to inform the Court jointly and promptly as to whether 1) they have indeed settled this matter; and 2) whether Plaintiff intends to prosecute this case further against Defendant Massanas via default judgment proceedings. Relatedly, the Initial Case Management Conference previously set to be held on Wednesday, August 21, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (Dkt. No. 22) is hereby adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein on 8/19/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
26 26 order Protective Order Wed 07/03 4:08 PM
STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein on 7/3/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Letter Wed 07/03 1:15 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein from Zachary P. Siegel dated July 3, 2024 re: requesting that the Court so order the parties' Proposed Stipulation and Protective Order. Document filed by Laurie Labesque, PUIG USA, INC...(Siegel, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order -Stipulation and Protective Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Redline - Model Stipulation and Protective Order
Friday, June 28, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 06/28 3:01 PM
Order. Application granted. The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for July 25 is adjourned to Wednesday, August 21, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. The conference access information outlined in the Courts June 4, 2024 Order (Dkt. No. 22) remains in effect. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein)(Text Only Order) (ta)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
23 23 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 06/27 3:56 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein from Zachary P. Siegel dated June 27, 2024. Document filed by Laurie Labesque, PUIG USA, INC...(Siegel, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 06/04 4:53 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/25/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gary Stein. The parties are directed to appear for a video conference via Microsoft Teams at the scheduled time. [Meeting ID: 216 411 975 808. Passcode: qFSPcq]. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein on 6/4/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/03 12:29 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Laurie Labesque..(DeLarco, Michael)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/03 12:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by PUIG USA, INC...(DeLarco, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 05/21 10:42 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 7/15/2024 at 09:30 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Thu 05/09 12:01 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 6/10/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
19 19 order Mediation Referral Order for Cases Filed Under the Fair Labor Standards Act Wed 05/08 12:38 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/22/2024. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 10/13/2023) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/30 11:40 AM
ORDER granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein from Michael E. DeLarco dated April 29, 2024.. Application granted. Defendant's time to respond to the complaint is hereby extended from May 2, 2024 to June 3, 2024. SO ORDERED. Laurie Labesque answer due 6/3/2024; PUIG USA, INC. answer due 6/3/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein on 4/30/2024) (tg) Modified on 4/30/2024 (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/29 9:51 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein from Michael E. DeLarco dated April 29, 2024. Document filed by Laurie Labesque, PUIG USA, INC...(DeLarco, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/29 9:48 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Puig North America Inc. for PUIG USA, INC.. Document filed by PUIG USA, INC...(Siegel, Zachary)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/29 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Phillip Siegel on behalf of Laurie Labesque, PUIG USA, INC...(Siegel, Zachary)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/29 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Emanuel DeLarco on behalf of Laurie Labesque, PUIG USA, INC...(DeLarco, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/11 2:32 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Sergio Massanas served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. Service was accepted by Mario Salinas. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/11 2:29 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Laurie Labesque served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. Service was accepted by Mario Salinas. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/11 2:27 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. PUIG USA, INC. served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. Service was accepted by Mario Salinas. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
utility Case Redesignation Wed 04/10 8:47 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is so redesignated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. (laq)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Reassignment of Referral to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/10 8:48 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein no longer referred to the case. (laq)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/09 12:11 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 4/9/2024) (ks) Modified on 4/9/2024 (ks)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/09 9:39 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 04/09 9:28 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sergio Massanas. (vf)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 04/09 9:26 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laurie Labesque. (vf)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 04/09 9:25 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PUIG USA, INC. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/09 9:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Darius Adam Marzec. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 04/09 9:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Darius Adam Marzec. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 04/09 9:20 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 04/09 9:20 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 04/09 9:21 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/08 5:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome Noll on behalf of Aisha Rosenfeld..(Noll, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/08 5:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SERGIO MASSANAS, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/08 4:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LAURIE LABESQUE, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/08 4:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PUIG USA, INC., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/08 4:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Laurie Labesque, Sergio Massanas, PUIG USA, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29190253)Document filed by Aisha Rosenfeld..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet