DOLE CHILE S.A. v. MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon S Broderick |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02651 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 46:1300 F.E.L.A. (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:23-cv-01504 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Cross Claimant
MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company .S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Gloucester Terminals LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Greenwich Terminals LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Holt Logistics Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MSC SHIP MANAGEMENT LTD.
|
|
Defendant
M/V MSC HARMONY III, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
|
|
Defendant
M/V POMERENIA SKY, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem,
|
|
Defendant
MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company .S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M/V MSC CELINE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
|
|
Defendant
M/V MSC CAROLE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Carriers 1-9
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE TERMINAL OPERATORS 3-9
|
|
Defendant
Holt Logistics Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Greenwich Terminals LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gloucester Terminals LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DOLE CHILE S.A.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
M/V MSC JENONGMIN, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
M/V MSC OLIA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
M/V MSC VITA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
CHOSEN PARTNER INVESTMENTs LTD.,
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
POMERENIA SKY INC.
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
RESOLUTE EXPORT & TRADING, LTD.
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
SALTGATE PANAMA SHIPPING, INC.
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
TAIPING & SINOPEC TJ7 SHIPPING LEASING CO., LTD.
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
Xinda International Ship Lease
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
M/V MSC AINO, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE TERMINAL OPERATORS 1-9
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
HARMONY SHIPPING & TRADING LTD.
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
|
Defendant
FPG Shipholding Liberia 17 SA
Terminated: 06/28/2023
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
45 | 45
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira N. Glauber on behalf of DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., Gloucester Terminals LLC, Greenwich Terminals LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC, Holt Logistics Corp...(Glauber, Ira) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Conference
Mon 04/22 2:14 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Martin F Casey dated April 22, 2024. Document filed by DOLE CHILE S.A...(Casey, Martin) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon Werner on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company.S.A...(Werner, Jon) |
|
42 | 42
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin F Casey on behalf of DOLE CHILE S.A...(Casey, Martin) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/09 12:53 PM
ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint status report by April 16, 2024. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/9/2024) (ate) |
|
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Tue 04/09 4:38 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-02643-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Tue 04/09 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr is no longer assigned to the case..(tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 04/08 4:06 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number: 2:23-cv-01504. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice - Transfer Case
Mon 04/08 4:11 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vba) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/08 4:11 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 4:12 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vba) |
||
misc
Note to Out of State Attorneys
Mon 04/08 4:12 PM
NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba) |
||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
39 | 39 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO.16 ) AND THE BILLS OF LADING (ECF NO22 -1), THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 03/29/2024. 03/29/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
38 | 38 8 pgs MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 03/29/2024. 03/29/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
37 | 37 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS6 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 3/20/24.3/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
36 | 36 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by STEPHEN J. GALATI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
35 | 35 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW on behalf of DOLE CHILE S.A. (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
34 | 34 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF EDWARD P. FLOOD, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 9/28/23. 9/28/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
33 | 33 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward P. Flood by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16970544.). (MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
32 | 32 SUR REPLY OF PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OFDEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC,DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC ANDHOLT LOGISTICS CORP. filed by DOLE CHILE S.A.. (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
31 | 31 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF, DOLE CHILE S.A (PLAINTIFF OR DOLE) UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. (TERMINAL OR SHORESIDE DEFENDANTS) TO DISMISS THE PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. C. P. 12(B)(6)22 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED, AND THE SUR-REPLY ATTACHED TO THE UNDERLYING MOTION AS EXHIBIT A SHALL BE DEEMED FILED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 9/14/23.9/15/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
30 | 30 ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIM OF MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY, S.A. by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. (HUGHES, PETER) Modified on 8/9/2023 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
29 | 29 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint [ECF 22] filed by DOLE CHILE S.A...(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Sur-Reply of Plaintiff in Opposition of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
28 | 28 REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6)22 (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
27 | 27 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION26 FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT22 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 8/3/23.8/3/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Main Document 27 replaced on 8/3/2023) (bw). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
26 | 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint [ECF 22] filed by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP..Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, July 26, 2023 | ||
25 | 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by DOLE CHILE S.A..(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law of Plaintiff Dole Chile S.A. in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
24 | 24 ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A..(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
23 | 23 ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint,,,, by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC..(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
22 | 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP..Memorandum of Law In Support and Certificate of Service.(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-DECLARATION OF LISA KLINE, ESQUIRE, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Terminal Holdings LP with Certificate of Service by HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC.(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
20 | 20 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC..(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
19 | 19 STIPULATION re16 Amended Complaint,,,, Time to File A Response Extended Until July 26, 2023 by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.. (HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
18 | 18 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by John J. Higson, Esquire Re: accepted summons and complaint for DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC. on 6/28/2023, answer due 7/19/2023; HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC on 6/28/2023, answer due 7/19/2023. (HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
17 | 17 Summons Issued as to DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, MSC SHIP MANAGEMENT LTD.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/30/23 (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
16 | 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP., JOHN DOE CARRIERS 1-9, JOHN DOE TERMINAL OPERATORS 1-9, M/V MSC AINO, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC CAROLE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC CELINE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC HARMONY III, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC JENONGMIN, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC OLIA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC VITA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V POMERENIA SKY, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem,, MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., MSC SHIP MANAGEMENT LTD., DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, filed by DOLE CHILE S.A..(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, Part 2 | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
15 | 15 RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to Loal Court Rule 7.1(c) In Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by DOLE CHILE S.A.. (GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
14 | 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC..(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
13 | 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A..(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
12 | 12 ANSWER to Complaint by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC..(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
11 | 11 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A..(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. HIGSON on behalf of GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. with Certificate of Service(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Terminal Holdings LP by GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC.(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Terminal Holdings LP by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC.(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
7 | 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HOLT LOGISTICS CORP..(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
6 | 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP...(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Lisa Kline, Esquire, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
5 | 5 Documents - Summons and Complaint were sent by the Clerk's Office via Certified Mail to MSC Shipmanagement Ltd., MSC House 8, Spyrou Kyprianou Avenue, 3070 Limassol, Cyprus, Registered NO. RF 563 911 850 US. (ke) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
4 | 4 Request to Clerk to Serve Summons and Complaint via Registered Mail, Return Receipt Requested upon Mediterranean Shipmanagement Ltd. by DOLE CHILE S.A.. (GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to CHOSEN PARTNER INVESTMENTS LTD.,, FPG SHIPHOLDING LIBERIA 17 SA, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HARMONY SHIPPING & TRADING LTD., HOLT LOGISTICS CORP., M/V MSC AINO, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC CAROLE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC CELINE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC HARMONY III, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC JENONGMIN, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC OLIA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC VITA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V POMERENIA SKY, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem,, MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., MSC SHIP MANAGEMENT LTD., POMERENIA SKY INC., RESOLUTE EXPORT & TRADING, LTD., SALTGATE PANAMA SHIPPING, INC., TAIPING & SINOPEC TJ7 SHIPPING LEASING CO., LTD., XINDA INTERNATIONAL SHIP LEASE. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/19/23 (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
2 | 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Dole plc by DOLE CHILE S.A..(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16637557.), filed by DOLE CHILE S.A..(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |