C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. v. MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon S Broderick |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02653 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 46:1300 F.E.L.A. (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:23-cv-01384 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Cross Claimant
MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company .S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Gloucester Terminals LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Greenwich Terminals LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Holt Logistics Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gloucester Terminals LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Greenwich Terminals LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Holt Logistics Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company .S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira N. Glauber on behalf of Gloucester Terminals LLC, Greenwich Terminals LLC, Holt Logistics Corp...(Glauber, Ira) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Conference
Mon 04/22 2:16 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Martin F Casey dated April 22, 2024. Document filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC...(Casey, Martin) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon Werner on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company.S.A...(Werner, Jon) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Tue 04/09 4:39 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-02643-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Tue 04/09 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Jesse M. Furman is no longer assigned to the case..(tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only..(tro) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 04/08 4:26 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number: 2:23-cv-01384. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice - Transfer Case
Mon 04/08 4:27 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vba) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/08 4:28 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 4:29 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vba) |
||
misc
Note to Out of State Attorneys
Mon 04/08 4:38 PM
NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba) |
||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
35 | 35 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO.13 ) AND THE BILLS OF LADING (ECF NO15 -1), THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 03/29/2024. 03/29/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
34 | 34 7 pgs MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 03/29/2024. 03/29//2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Case Transferred to the United States District Court - Southern District of New York via the court's electronic filing system. (nd) Modified on 3/29/2024 (nd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
33 | 33 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS5 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 3/20/24.3/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
32 | 32 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF EDWARD P. FLOOD, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 9/28/23. 9/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
31 | 31 SUR REPLY OF PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
30 | 30 REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) [ECF 15].(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
29 | 29 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED, AND THE REPLY ATTACHED TO THE UNDERLYING MOTION AS EXHIBIT A SHALL BE DEEMED FILED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED, AND THE SUR REPLY ATTACHED TO THE UNDERLYING MOTION AS EXHIBIT A SHALL BE DEEMED FILED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 9/27/23.9/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
28 | 28 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward P. Flood by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16970514.). (MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
27 | 27 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC..Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply.(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, August 16, 2023 | ||
26 | 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief - Uncontested filed by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Counsel, and Certificate of Service.(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Reply Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
25 | 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.. (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) Modified on 8/10/2023 (nd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
24 | 24 ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIM OF MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY, S.A. by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. (HUGHES, PETER) Modified on 8/9/2023 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE (RECEIPT NUMBER APAEDC-16812755) FILED ON 07/14/2023 REFUNDED DUE TO REJECTED APPLICATION WHICH WAS REFILED LATER IN THE DAY. (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
23 | 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PARTIES TO THE ABOVE-ENTITLED ACTION, THROUGH THEIR RESPECTIVE ATTORNEYS, AGREE THAT PLAINTIFF, C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. HAS UNTIL AUGUST 10, 2023 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED WITH THE COURT ON JULY 12, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 7/25/23. 7/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
22 | 22 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE19 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 7/24/23.7/24/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
21 | 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.. (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
20 | 20 ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A..(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
19 | 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16814711.) filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC...(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
18 | 18 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MARTIN F. CASEY, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT, IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 7/14/23.7/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
17 | 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16812755.) filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC...(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW on behalf of C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
15 | 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP..Memorandum of Law In Support and Certificate of Service.(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-DECLARATION OF LISA KLINE, ESQUIRE, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
14 | 14 STIPULATION re13 Amended Complaint Time to File A Response Extended Until July 26, 2023 by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.. (HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC..(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
12 | 12 RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Notice of Plaintiffs of Intention to file Amended Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c) filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.. (GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
11 | 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A..(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
10 | 10 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A..(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. HIGSON on behalf of GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. with Certificate of Service(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Terminal Holdings LP by GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC.(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
7 | 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Terminal Holdings LP by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC.(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
6 | 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HOLT LOGISTICS CORP..(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
5 | 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP...(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Lisa Kline, Esquire, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/12/23 (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. Designation Form (GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
2 | 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including CH Robinson Worldwide Inc. by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC..(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16621282.), filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC..(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Certification Statement in the Related Case section was not checked off. (sbt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.] |