United States of America v. Alexander et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas R Cole |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00192 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 5:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Ruth A. Alexander
|
|
Defendant
Stanley L. Alexander
|
|
Defendant
Associated Enterprises Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Anna E. Haller
|
|
Defendant
State of Ohio
|
|
Defendant
Treasurer of Montgomery County, Ohio
|
|
Defendant
Treasurer of Warren County, Ohio
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/01 8:49 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by State of Ohio. (Steinmetz, Cory) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/23 4:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Treasurer of Montgomery County, Ohio. Treasurer of Montgomery County, Ohio served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Bednar, Philip) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/23 4:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Treasurer of Warren County, Ohio. Treasurer of Warren County, Ohio served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Bednar, Philip) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/23 4:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Anna E. Haller. Anna E. Haller served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Bednar, Philip) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/23 4:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ruth A. Alexander. Ruth A. Alexander served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Bednar, Philip) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/23 4:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Stanley L. Alexander. Stanley L. Alexander served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Bednar, Philip) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/16 1:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Treasurer of Warren County, Ohio. (Horvath, Kathryn) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/11 3:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant State of Ohio. State of Ohio served on 4/11/2024, answer due 5/2/2024. (Bednar, Philip) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 8:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Ruth A. Alexander, Stanley L. Alexander, Associated Enterprises Ltd., Anna E. Haller, State of Ohio, Treasurer of Montgomery County, Ohio, and Treasurer of Warren County, Ohio. (zmc) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 04/09 8:46 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (zmc) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Bednar, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Tax Court opinion, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form Stanley Alexander, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Form Ruth Alexander, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Form Anna Haller, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Form Associated Enterprises Ltd., | ||
Att: 7 Summons Form State of Ohio, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Form Treasurer of Warren Co., | ||
Att: 9 Summons Form Treasurer of Montgomery Co. |