Stewart v. Sound Retirement Trust et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Mustafa T Kasubhai |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00588 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 2:13 PM PDT |
Defendant
Sound Retirement Trust
(fka Retail Clerks Pension Trust) 11724 NE 195th Street, Ste 300
Bothell, WA 98011 |
|
Defendant
Zenith American Solutions
707 W Main Avenue #B1
Spokane, WA 99201 |
|
Plaintiff
Donald Stewart
On Behalf of the Estate of Alberta Stewart Southwest Portland Law Group 8455 SW Beaverton Hillsdale Hwy
Portland, OR 97225 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Summons
Mon 04/22 3:29 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Sound Retirement Trust waiver sent on 4/8/2024. Filed by Donald Stewart. (Cowell, Jesse) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Summons
Mon 04/22 12:01 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Zenith American Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 4/8/2024. Filed by Donald Stewart. (Cowell, Jesse) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/11 4:37 PM
Case Management Order signed on 4/11/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Tue 04/09 10:09 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/7/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/6/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 9/6/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw) |
|
oth_evt
Correction of the Record
Tue 04/09 1:01 PM
Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding1 Complaint (Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The PDF was not flattened. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 11:14 AM
First Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9358815 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Donald Stewart against Sound Retirement Trust, Zenith American Solutions. (Cowell, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Stewart |