6
|
|
6
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/16 4:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: (Discovery due by 12/11/2024., Motions due by 12/16/2024., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/14/2025., Jury Trial set for 4/21/2025 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Calendar Call set for 4/17/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2025 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Pretrial Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (jlo)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
answer
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Mon 04/15 10:03 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Jacek Skarzynski, Olga Skarzynski. (Fombrun, Charles)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/09 5:26 PM
NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Jacek Skarzynski, Olga Skarzynski (Fombrun, Charles)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Tue 04/09 8:51 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (wce)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 04/09 8:51 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Mon 04/08 5:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17431455, filed by Olga Skarzynski, Jacek Skarzynski.(Fombrun, Charles)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Exhibit A
|