Derbas v. Jackson County Sheriff's Office et al
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Phil Gilbert |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01060 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 5:08 PM CDT |
Defendant
Currently unknown Jackson County Sheriff's Office employees
|
|
Defendant
Currently unknown Williamson County Sheriff's Office employees
|
|
Defendant
Jackson County
|
|
Defendant
Jackson County Sheriff's Office
|
|
Defendant
Williamson County
|
|
Defendant
Williamson County Sheriff's Office
|
|
Plaintiff
Derick Derbas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Thu 04/11 3:48 PM
SCREENING ORDER: Represented by counsel, Derick Derbas brings this civil rights action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 for violations of his rights by Jackson and Williamson County defendants who denied him medical care for a testicular torsion at Jackson County Jail on March 19-22, 2023 and Williamson County Jail on March 22-23, 2023. The Complaint survives screening under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, as follows: COUNT 1 - Fourteenth Amendment claim against Jackson County Sheriff's Office Employees 1 and 2 for the objectively unreasonable denial of medical care for a testicular torsion in March 2023; COUNT 2 - Fourteenth Amendment claim against Williamson County Sheriff's Office Employees 1 and 2 for the objectively unreasonable denial of medical care for a testicular torsion in March 2023; COUNT 3 - Illinois state law indemnification claim under 745 ILCS 10/9-102 against Jackson County and Jackson County Sheriff's Office; and COUNT 4 - Illinois state law indemnification claim under 745 ILCS 10/9-102 against Williamson County and Williamson County Sheriff's Office. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ADD the Jackson and Williamson County Sheriffs (official capacities only), and both of these defendants shall be responsible for assisting in the identification of Unknown County Employees 1 and 2. Counsel for Plaintiff may initiate service of this lawsuit on DEFENDANTS, including the County Sheriffs, without further delay. Once the County Sheriff's file an appearance, the Court will enter a limited John/Jane Doe Identification Order to help identify the unknown defendants by name, so that Plaintiff may affect service of this lawsuit on them. Once served with this suit, Defendants are ORDERED to timely file an appropriate responsive pleading to the Complaint and shall not waive filing a reply pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1997e(g). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/11/2024. (jsy) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. Marx on behalf of Derick Derbas (Marx, Jason) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn William Barnett on behalf of Derick Derbas (Barnett, Shawn) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice Requesting Consent
Tue 04/09 8:32 AM
NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Derick Derbas to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Derick Derbas on 4/9/2024. Consent due by 4/30/2024. (jle) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Opening Notification
Tue 04/09 8:31 AM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 24-cv-1060-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (jle) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5359933.), filed by Derick Derbas.(Barnett, Shawn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |