Oval Capital Limited Liability Company et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate/Policy No. 798200, Authority Ref NO B174010045SS22
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Denise L Cote |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02661 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 6:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE/POLICY NO. 798200, AUTHORITY REF NO B174010045SS22
|
|
Plaintiff
OVAL CAPITAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (d/b/a OVAL CAPITAL MANAGEMENT)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIFERET VENTURES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 04/11 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/13/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/11/2024) (vfr) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 3:00 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate/Policy No. 798200, Authority Ref NO B174010045SS22..(pc) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 11:40 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oval Capital Limited Liability Company, Tiferet Ventures, LLC..(Agulnick, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 11:57 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Agulnick, Scott) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 04/09 10:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Evan Agulnick. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE/POLICY NO. 798200, AUTHORITY REF NO B174010045SS22; OVAL CAPITAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (d/b/a OVAL CAPITAL MANAGEMENT), TIFERET VENTURES, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 10:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Scott Evan Agulnick to Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020; the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 10:29 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 10:29 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 10:29 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 5:38 PM
COMPLAINT against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE/POLICY NO. 798200, AUTHORITY REF NO B174010045SS22. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29190561)Document filed by OVAL CAPITAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (d/b/a OVAL CAPITAL MANAGEMENT), TIFERET VENTURES, LLC..(Agulnick, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet |