Gorin v. Touro University
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Denise L Cote |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02662 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332ed Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 6:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Touro University
|
|
Plaintiff
Beth R. Gorin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 04/12 3:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Touro University waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. Document filed by Beth R. Gorin..(Skarbnik, Carly) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mariah L Passarelli on behalf of Touro University..(Passarelli, Mariah) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 10:40 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Touro University. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Tue 04/09 10:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Carly Jane Skarbnik. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 10:36 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 10:37 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 10:37 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 6:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Touro University, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Beth R. Gorin..(Skarbnik, Carly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 6:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Skarbnik, Carly) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 6:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Touro University. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29190718)Document filed by Beth R. Gorin..(Skarbnik, Carly) |