Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:24-cv-00400
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 9:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Clay Moore
Represented By
Clinton Edward Hunter Brush
Butler Snow LLP
contact info
David L. Johnson
Bulter Snow
contact info
Intervenor
Protean Ventures, LLC
Represented By
W. Scott Sims
Sims Funk, PLC
contact info
Margaret R.T. Myers
Adams And Reese Llp (nashville-Church Street)
contact info
Danielle M. Crane
Kegler Brown Hill + Ritter
contact info
Nicholas S. Bobb
Kegler Brown Hill + Ritter
contact info
Gibeault C. Creson
Sims Funk, PLC
contact info
Michael R. O'Neill
Sims Funk, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Titan Cloud Software, LLC
Represented By
Glenn Scott Thomas
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Jeremy A. Gunn
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Paige Waldrop Mills
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info

GPO Dec 12 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/11/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)

Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 03/05 10:47 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per Stipulation62 and chambers. No order to enter. (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
62 62 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/04 2:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Titan Cloud Software, LLC. (Mills, Paige)
Related: [-]