Anderson v. O'Malley
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen R Bough |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-03095 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 3:21 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Elizabeth D Hatting on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Attorney Elizabeth D Hatting added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft))(Hatting, Elizabeth) |
|
5 | 5
soc_sec
Notice of SSA Action Commenced
Wed 04/17 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Social Security Case. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has generated a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the U.S. Attorney's Office of the case filing. No summons shall issue. (Hanna, Jaime) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
sscmp
Complaint - Social Security
Tue 04/09 8:28 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kelsey Young on behalf of Edna Anderson. (Filing fee $405 receipt number IFP) filed byKelsey Young on behalf of Edna Anderson.(Young, Kelsey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/08 5:27 PM
ORDER granting1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 04/08/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Lock, Tania) |
|
2 | 2
order
Letter of reassignment
Mon 04/08 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge David P. Rush to District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Magistrate Judge David P. Rush no longer associated with this case. New case number is: 24-3095 CV-S-SRB. (Text entry only; no document attached.) (Hanna, Jaime) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/08 3:45 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kelsey Young on behalf of Edna Anderson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/22/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Attorney Kelsey Young added to party Edna Anderson(pty:pla))(Young, Kelsey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit complaint | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment
Mon 04/08 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to All Parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 4/29/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime) |