Schultz et al v. Director, Nebraska Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Bataillon |
Referred: | Susan M Bazis |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-03066 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 6:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Director, Nebraska Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
|
Plaintiff
Hybrid International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnathan Schultz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
4
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 12:44 PM
ORDER APPOINTING MASTER that having given notice of its intent to appoint a master, having offered the parties an opportunity to be heard, having considered the master's affidavit regarding grounds of disqualification, and having obtained the consent of the parties, the Court hereby appoints Kate Rahel as master in this case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53(a)(1)(A) & (C). The progression order is hereby modified to indicate that, until such time as a new magistrate judge is assigned to this case, the parties should contact the master prior to filing a motion to compel, to quash, or for disputed protective order to set a conference for discussing the parties' dispute. Additionally, all requests for change of deadlines or settings or any other matters previously directed to the magistrate judge shall be directed to the master. The parties can contact the master by calling Judge Bataillon's chambers at (402) 661-7302 or emailing Special_Master@ned.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Reassignment Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings
Fri 04/12 11:50 AM
ORDER that the Honorable Susan Bazis was recently confirmed to serve as U.S. District Court Judge, thereby leaving a vacancy for her prior position as Magistrate Judge. This case was previously assigned to Magistrate Judge Bazis for judicial supervision. Until such time as this vacancy is filled, there exist pretrial and posttrial matters in the case that cannot be effectively and timely reassigned to an available judge of the district. Accordingly, the Court has determined it is necessary to appoint a master to ensure the timely progression of this case. Such appointment shall be of temporary duration and shall end upon the appointment of a new Magistrate Judge. The parties are given 14 days to file any objections to this proposed appointment. If the parties do not consent to the appointment of a master, the case will remain assigned solely to Judge Bataillon until a new Magistrate Judge is appointed. If the Court receives no objections, it will deem the parties to have consented to the appointment and will file the attached Appointment Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JLS) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 8:36 AM
Summons Issued as to defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Attorney's Office, and U.S. Attorney General. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Requested
Mon 04/08 4:47 PM
Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint,1 . (Dominguez, Anthony) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Requested
Mon 04/08 4:46 PM
Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint,1 . (Dominguez, Anthony) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Requested
Mon 04/08 4:45 PM
Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint,1 . (Dominguez, Anthony) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 4:36 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Director, Nebraska Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) |
|
5 | 5
oth_evt
Assignment of Judges
Mon 04/08 4:25 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Requested
Mon 04/08 4:17 PM
Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint,1 . (Dominguez, Anthony) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/08 3:20 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice2 for attorney Anthony R. Dominguez. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO) |
|
2 | 2
oth_doc
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/08 3:16 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5064909 by Attorney Anthony R. Dominguez on behalf of Plaintiffs Hybrid International, LLC, Johnathan Schultz.(Dominguez, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit SDFLA Certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit FL Supreme Court Certificate of good standing | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Director, Nebraska Service Center, USCIS ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5064883), by Attorney Anthony R. Dominguez on behalf of Johnathan Schultz, Hybrid International, LLC(Dominguez, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Appendix to Complaint |