Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Charles Goodwin
Case #: 5:24-cv-00350
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Terminated:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 7:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Avenue East Apartments LLC
Defendant
Hilary Clifton
Defendant
Ashley Hounchell
Defendant
Payne County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant
Phillips Murrah PC
Defendant
SCION Group LLC The
Defendant
Sheriff of Payne County
Plaintiff
Charlene Y Latham
101 N Main St C/O GenDel
Joplin, MO 64801


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, February 10, 2025
14 14 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Mon 02/10 3:47 PM
ORDER denying12 Motion to Disqualify and13 Motion to Reinstate Case. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 02/10/2025. (jb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
13 13 1 pgs motion Order Thu 12/26 11:36 AM
MOTION for Order to Reinstate Case by Charlene Y Latham.(llr) (Main Document 13 replaced on 12/26/2024) (llr). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/26/2024) (llr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Brief in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Envelope
12 12 9 pgs motion Order Thu 12/26 11:33 AM
MOTION for Order to Disqualify Judge by Charlene Y Latham.(llr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Affidavit in Support of Judicial Recusal Motion,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, November 22, 2024
11 11 order Judgment Fri 11/22 4:17 PM
JUDGMENT. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 11/22/2024. (jb)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs order Order Fri 11/22 4:15 PM
ORDER. The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all claims alleged in Plaintiff Charlene Y. Latham's Complaint (Doc. No.1 ) for failure of service under Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 11/22/2024. (jb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 08/05 3:48 PM
ORDER. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to show cause in writing, within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order, why her claims against the defendants should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 08/05/2024. (jb)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Mon 08/05 3:46 PM
ORDER denying5 Motion for ECF Permissions. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 08/05/2024. (jb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/24 11:18 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/24/2024. (mc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/14 11:02 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlene Y Latham.(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Court IFP Application,
Att: 2 Envelope
5 5 2 pgs motion Order Tue 05/14 11:01 AM
MOTION for Order titled, "Plaintiff's Motion for ECF Permissions" by Charlene Y Latham.(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
4 4 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 05/14 11:00 AM
ENTRY of Appearance- Pro Se by Charlene Y Latham(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/10 2:27 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated herein by submitting an amended application to proceed in forma pauperis on or before May 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 04/10/2024. (jb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/08 3:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlene Y Latham.(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/08 3:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Avenue East Apartments LLC, Hilary Clifton, Ashley Hounchell, Payne County Board of County Commissioners, Phillips Murrah PC, SCION Group LLC The, Sheriff of Payne County(State of Oklahoma; in his individual capacity), Sheriff of Payne County(State of Oklahoma; in his official capacity) filed by Charlene Y Latham.(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
misc Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address Mon 04/08 3:28 PM
Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form and copy of1 Complaint to Charlene Y Latham 101 N Main St C/O GenDel Joplin, MO 64801 (rp)
Related: [-]