Utah District Court
Judge:Jill N Parrish
Case #: 2:24-cv-00255
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 8:08 AM MDT
Defendant
Zeda Technologies Inc.
Represented By
Blaine J. Benard
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Avtech Capital LLC
Represented By
Richard F. Ensor
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Evan S. Strassberg
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 misc Mail Returned Mon 04/28 3:40 PM
Mail sent to Zeda Technologies Inc re docket entry20 Returned as Undeliverable/Unclaimed/Unable to Forward. No other address available: nothing will be resent. (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 04/07 8:56 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant is directed to respond to the court in writing within fourteen (14) days after entry of this Order and explain why counsel has not appeared on behalf of Defendant and why no Answer to the Amended Complaint has been filed. If Defendant fails to comply with this Order, Plaintiff may file a motion for entry of default judgment. Service of this Order is provided using the CM/ECF system to all parties and to Defendant at its available address(es). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 4/4/25. (dle)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
19 19 misc Mail Returned Mon 01/06 2:54 PM
Mail sent to Zeda Technologies Returned as Undeliverable. (dle)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
18 18 misc Mail Returned Mon 12/09 4:41 PM
Mail sent to Zeda Technologies re docket entries16 ,17 Returned as Undeliverable/Vacant. Mail resent to another address found on internet, 1120 Strategic Parkway Ste 300, Springdale, OH 45246 (alt)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
17 17 misc Mail Returned Fri 11/15 8:48 AM
Mail sent to Zeda Technologies Inc. Returned as Undeliverable. Mailing packet containing16 Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel resent on 11/15/2024 to address located on internet: 4026 CLIPPER CT, FREMONT, CA 94538. (dle)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Mon 10/21 1:02 PM
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Blaine J. Benard withdrawn from case for Defendant Zeda Technologies. New counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance on behalf of any corporation, association, partnership or other artificial entity whose attorney has withdrawn. Pursuant to DUCivR 83-1.3, no such entity may appear pro se, but must be represented by an attorney who is admitted to practice in this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/21/24. (dle)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
15 15 motion Withdraw as Counsel Fri 10/18 5:31 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Defendant Zeda Technologies Inc.. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Benard, Blaine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
utility Remark Wed 10/16 11:34 AM
Remark: Upon reviewing the corporate disclosure statement of Avtech Capital, LLC, the court determines that it has made a prima facie showing of diversity jurisdiction. (ead)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
13 13 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Mon 10/14 11:31 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Avtech Capital LLC. (Strassberg, Evan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 10/04 10:25 AM
ORDER to Allege the Citizenship of the Parties. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/4/24. (dle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/20 1:51 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Zeda Technologies Inc.. filed by Avtech Capital LLC. (Strassberg, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Acknowledgment Wed 07/03 1:16 PM
NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order9 filed by Plaintiff Avtech Capital LLC (Strassberg, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
9 9 order Civil Standing Order Wed 06/26 1:50 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/26/2024. (lwh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
utility Reassignment to District Judge Fri 05/31 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish and Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Thu 05/09 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Avtech Capital LLC, Defendant Zeda Technologies Inc.. Form due by 5/30/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/08 12:19 PM
ORDER granting 5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Zeda Technologies Inc. to 5/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 5/8/2024. (alf)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/08 10:58 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Zeda Technologies Inc.. Attorney Blaine J. Benard added to party Zeda Technologies Inc.(pty:dft)(Benard, Blaine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/17 12:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avtech Capital L.L.C.. Summons served on Zeda Technologies Inc., on 4/16/2024. (Strassberg, Evan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Electronically Thu 04/11 9:13 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Zeda Technologies Inc.. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
2 2 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Tue 04/09 1:03 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 04/09/2024. (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Mon 04/08 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Zeda Technologies Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5025203) filed by Avtech Capital L.L.C.. (Strassberg, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/08 2:26 PM
Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00255-CMR. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
Related: [-]