OvaInnovations, LLC
Wisconsin Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Catherine J Furay |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-10663 |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
OvaInnovations, LLC
316 W Washington Ave Ste 500A
Madison, WI 53703-3050 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee's Office
780 Regent Street, Suite 304
Madison, WI 53715 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Continued
Wed 05/01 12:16 PM
Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors (866) 818-1445; passcode: 1578204 . 341(a) meeting scheduled for 5/22/2024 at 01:00 PM at Telephone Conference. (Thill, Brian) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
trustee
Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee
Mon 04/29 4:58 PM
U.S. Trustee's Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee. (Thill, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
52
pgs
misc
Schedules/Statements/Summary/Declaration/Disclosure of Compensation/List of Creditors
Wed 04/24 6:28 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Declaration, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Wed 04/17 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors . No. of Notices: 101. Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
court
Notice of Meeting of Creditors, Amended (auto form)
Mon 04/15 2:53 PM
341(a) meeting scheduled for 5/1/2024 at 09:00 AM at 341 by Telephone Chapter 11. Amended Notice of Meeting of Creditors Amended to add telephone (866) 818-1445; passcode: 1578204 to notice . cc: via BNC to all parties (Smith, Ronald) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 04/12 11:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors . No. of Notices: 103. Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
38 | 38
order
Joint Administration
Fri 04/12 4:38 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration cc: parties in int. Signed on 4/12/2024. (Madison, Emily) |
|
37 | 37
order
Expedite Hearing
Fri 04/12 4:14 PM
Order Granting Motion for Expedited Hearing and to Shorten Notice of First Day Motions cc: parties in int. Signed on 4/12/2024. (Madison, Emily) |
|
36 | 36
chap
Hearing Held
Fri 04/12 2:33 PM
PM/ORDER Hearing Held on Motion by Debtor to Use Cash Collateral and Provide Adequate Protection. OUTCOME : For the reasons stated from the bench, the Motion for use of cash collateral and to provide adequate protection is granted on an interim basis. The amount of adequate protection paid to IsoNova Technologies, LLC (IsoNova) and to Dairy Farmers of America (DFA) shall be modified as stated on the record to be confirmed in amount by Debtors, IsoNova and DFA. Interim use shall also be subject to the submission of a budget containing detail on proposed payments to secured creditors and shall further contain detail related to the proposed payments to utility providers. Further, Attorney Sederholm shall submit a revised interim order. Such order shall also provide an opportunity for the United States Trustee and other parties in interest to review any information necessary to review the Debtors' conclusion regarding the validity, perfection, and priority of the security interest of IsoNova or DFA and, as may be necessary, to raise questions or objections thereto prior to entry of any final order. (Doc # 3 ). (Madison, Emily) |
|
35 | 35
chap
Hearing Held
Fri 04/12 2:18 PM
PM/ORDER Hearing Held on Motion by Debtor for Interim and Final Orders regarding Utility Providers. OUTCOME : For the reasons stated from the bench, Utility providers shall file any objections to the proposed adequate protection regarding utilities on or before April 29, 2024. Debtor shall provide notice of this deadline to all utility providers. The City of Adrian has filed an objection and the pending objection shall serve as an objection and request for hearing. Pending a final hearing on the City of Adrian objection, the Debtors shall provide a one month security deposit on or before 4/29/24 as interim adequate assurance of payment. Further Debtors shall pay the current bill in full when due. (Doc # 4) (Madison, Tina) |
|
34 | 34
chap
Hearing Held
Fri 04/12 1:42 PM
PM/ORDER Hearing Held on Motion by Debtor for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Case. OUTCOME : For the reasons stated from the bench, the motion is granted. Order to be submitted by the Court. (Doc # 5) (Madison, Tina) |
|
33 | 33
chap
Hearing Held
Fri 04/12 1:30 PM
PM/ORDER Hearing Held on Motion by Debtor to Expedite Hearing and to Shorten Notice on First Day Motions. OUTCOME : For the reasons stated from the bench, the motion is granted. (Doc # 6) (Madison, Tina) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Proof of Service
Fri 04/12 6:25 AM
Proof of Service filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC. Related document(s)27 ,28 Proposed Order filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Proposed Order filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice
Thu 04/11 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
30 | 30
answer
Objection
Thu 04/11 6:08 PM
Objection filed by Iana Vladimirova on behalf of IsoNova Technologies, LLC. Related document(s)3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Provide Adequate Protection filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC.(Vladimirova, Iana) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 04/11 6:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Iana Vladimirova on behalf of IsoNova Technologies, LLC. (Vladimirova, Iana) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Proposed Order - attorney
Thu 04/11 4:42 PM
Proposed Order filed by Attorney Kristin J. Sederholm of Krekeler Law, S.C. on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC . Order to be signed on or after 4/12/2024. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Proposed Order - attorney
Thu 04/11 4:41 PM
Proposed Order filed by Attorney Kristin J. Sederholm of Krekeler Law, S.C. on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC . Order to be signed on or after 4/12/2024. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 04/11 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Nicole I Pellerin, Attorney on behalf of David Rettig. (Pellerin, Attorney, Nicole) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Proof of Service
Thu 04/11 2:39 PM
Proof of Service filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC. Related document(s)8 ,10 ,9 ,5 ,11 ,3 ,7 ,4 ,6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Provide Adequate Protection filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders regarding Utility Providers with attachment filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Case filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing and to Shorten Notice of First Day Motions filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Declaration filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Declaration filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Proposed Order filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Proposed Order filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Notice of Motion filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
24 | 24
answer
Objection
Thu 04/11 2:17 PM
Objection filed by John J. Stockdale Jr on behalf of City of Adrian. Related document(s)3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Provide Adequate Protection filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC.(Stockdale, John) |
|
23 | 23
answer
Objection
Thu 04/11 2:16 PM
Objection filed by John J. Stockdale Jr on behalf of City of Adrian. Related document(s)4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders regarding Utility Providers with attachment filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC.(Stockdale, John) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Proof of Service
Wed 04/10 7:49 PM
Proof of Service to utility companies filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC. Related document(s)8 ,10 ,9 ,5 ,11 ,3 ,7 ,4 ,6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Provide Adequate Protection filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders regarding Utility Providers with attachment filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Case filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing and to Shorten Notice of First Day Motions filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Declaration filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Declaration filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Proposed Order filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Proposed Order filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Notice of Motion filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
21 | 21
court
Notice of Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (auto form)
Wed 04/10 9:39 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors by telephone (866) 818-1445; passcode: 1578204 . cc: via BNC to all parties. 341(a) meeting scheduled for 5/1/2024 at 09:00 AM at Telephone Conference. Deadline to file a complaint to challenge dischargeability of certain debts is 7/1/2024. (Thill, Brian) |
|
utility
Generic Notification (Open Text) (auto form)
Wed 04/10 2:01 PM
Clerk's Notification to Attorney Sederholm, the Proof of Service does not appear to include all of the utility providers, listed in the motion as an attachment . Related document(s)20 ,4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders regarding Utility Providers with attachment filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Proof of Service filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC. (Madison, Tina) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Proof of Service
Tue 04/09 8:07 PM
Proof of Service filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC. Related document(s)8 ,10 ,9 ,5 ,11 ,3 ,7 ,4 ,6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Provide Adequate Protection filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders regarding Utility Providers with attachment filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Case filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing and to Shorten Notice of First Day Motions filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Declaration filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Declaration filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Proposed Order filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Proposed Order filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Notice of Motion filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
19 | 19
court
Hearing: Sched/Cont/Resched (AUTO form)
Tue 04/09 12:07 PM
Preliminary hearing scheduled for 4/12/2024 at 09:00 AM at Madison Hearings, Courtroom 350 on Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Case . Moving party to send or serve notice. (Notice has been docketed #11) . (Madison, Tina) |
|
18 | 18
court
Hearing: Sched/Cont/Resched (AUTO form)
Tue 04/09 12:06 PM
Preliminary hearing scheduled for 4/12/2024 at 09:00 AM at Madison Hearings, Courtroom 350 on Motion for Interim and Final Orders regarding Utility Providers . Moving party to send or serve notice. (Notice has been docketed #11) . (Madison, Tina) |
|
17 | 17
court
Hearing: Sched/Cont/Resched (AUTO form)
Tue 04/09 12:05 PM
Preliminary hearing scheduled for 4/12/2024 at 09:00 AM at Madison Hearings, Courtroom 350 on Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Adequate Protection . Moving party to send or serve notice. (Notice has been docketed #11) . (Madison, Tina) |
|
16 | 16
court
Hearing: Sched/Cont/Resched (AUTO form)
Tue 04/09 12:03 PM
Preliminary hearing scheduled for 4/12/2024 at 09:00 AM at Madison Hearings, Courtroom 350 on Motion to Expedite Hearing . Moving party to send or serve notice. (Notice has been docketed #11) . (Madison, Tina) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/09 10:01 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Brian P. Thill on behalf of U.S. Trustee's Office. (Thill, Brian) |
|
14 | 14
court
Notice of Deficiency for Non-Individual Ch. 7 or ANY Ch. 11/12 ( auto form)
Tue 04/09 9:02 AM
Incomplete Filings due 4/22/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/22/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/22/2024. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation due 4/22/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/22/2024. Schedule D due 4/22/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/22/2024. Schedule G due 4/22/2024. Schedule H due 4/22/2024. Notice of Deficiency . (Madison, Emily) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Order - attorney
Mon 04/08 8:30 PM
Proposed Order filed by Attorney Kristin J. Sederholm of Krekeler Law, S.C. on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC . Order to be signed on or after 4/30/2024. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Employ
Mon 04/08 8:29 PM
Application to Employ Kristin J. Sederholm as Attorney with Declaration filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC. [Note: FRBP 6003 prohibits the Court from issuing an order prior to 4/29/2024.] (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Motion
Mon 04/08 8:10 PM
Notice of Motion for Expedited Hearing and Notice of First Day Motions filed by OvaInnovations, LLC. Related document(s)5 ,3 ,4 ,6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Provide Adequate Protection filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders regarding Utility Providers with attachment filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Case filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing and to Shorten Notice of First Day Motions filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC. Last Day to File Objections/Request for Hearing: 4/12/2024. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Order - attorney
Mon 04/08 7:50 PM
Proposed Order filed by Attorney Kristin J. Sederholm of Krekeler Law, S.C. on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC . Order to be signed on or after 4/12/2024. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Order - attorney
Mon 04/08 7:48 PM
Proposed Order filed by Attorney Kristin J. Sederholm of Krekeler Law, S.C. on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC . Order to be signed on or after 4/12/2024. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Declaration
Mon 04/08 7:38 PM
Declaration of David L Rettig in Support of First Day Motions filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC. Related document(s)5 ,3 ,4 ,6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Provide Adequate Protection filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders regarding Utility Providers with attachment filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Case filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing and to Shorten Notice of First Day Motions filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Declaration
Mon 04/08 7:26 PM
Declaration /Certification in Support of Motion For Expedited Hearing and to Shorten Notice on First Day Motions filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC. Related document(s)6 Motion to Expedite Hearing and to Shorten Notice of First Day Motions filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Expedite Hearing
Mon 04/08 7:25 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing and to Shorten Notice of First Day Motions filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC. Related document(s)5 ,3 ,4 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Provide Adequate Protection filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders regarding Utility Providers with attachment filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC, Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Case filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
5 | 5
7
pgs
motion
Joint Administration
Mon 04/08 7:02 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Case filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC.. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
4 | 4
9
pgs
motion
Chapter 11 First Day Motion
Mon 04/08 6:53 PM
Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders regarding Utility Providers with attachment filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
3 | 3
8
pgs
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Mon 04/08 6:52 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Provide Adequate Protection filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC.. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 04/08 5:37 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement. filed by Kristin J. Sederholm on behalf of OvaInnovations, LLC. Related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor OvaInnovations, LLC. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
1 | 1
24
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11-NEVER USE)
Mon 04/08 5:35 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition [ Fee Amount $ 1738] filed by OvaInnovations, LLC. Incomplete Filings due 04/22/2024. (Sederholm, Kristin) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Mon 04/08 6:12 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:3 24-10663 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A9061927, amount $1738.00. (Sederholm, Kristin) (U.S. Treasury) |