California Eastern District Court
Judge:Erica P Grosjean
Case #: 1:24-cv-00417
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Terminated:Apr 10, 2024
Defendant
Alvarez
Defendant
April Asbel
Defendant
Charles B. Smith
Defendant
Charles Frye
Defendant
Ciummo
Defendant
David Singer
Defendant
Fitzgerald
Defendant
Law Firm/ LLP of Charles B. Smith and Nathan Nutting
Defendant
Leigh Fleming
Defendant
Nathan Nutting
Plaintiff
Douglas Murphy

GPO Apr 10 2024
ORDER TRANSFERRING the Case to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California Federal Court signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/10/2024. New Case Number 2:24-cv-01071-AC(PC). (Sant Agata, S)

Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Transferred Out - Divisional Wed 04/10 10:52 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING the Case to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California Federal Court signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/10/2024. New Case Number 2:24-cv-01071-AC(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 04/08 2:52 PM
MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Douglas Murphy. (Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/08 2:51 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Douglas Murphy. (Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Mon 04/08 2:50 PM
(1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Alvarez, April Asbel, Ciummo, Fitzgerald, Leigh Fleming, Charles Frye, Law Firm/ LLP of Charles B. Smith and Nathan Nutting, Nathan Nutting, David Singer, Charles B. Smith by Douglas Murphy.(Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]