Avery v. Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Mcshane |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00593 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 5:10 PM PDT |
Defendant
Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Avery
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons/Service Return (All Types)
Wed 05/01 6:40 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad served on 4/23/2024, answer due on 5/14/2024. (Furniss, Ryan) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 1:00 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (le) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver
Thu 04/18 7:52 AM
Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad on 4/18/2024 by Kevin Avery. Waiver of Service is due by 5/20/2024. Filed by Kevin Avery. (Furniss, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Draft Waiver of Summons | ||
5 | 5
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/18 7:47 AM
Notice of Appearance of Ryan M Furniss appearing on behalf of Kevin Avery . Filed by on behalf of Kevin Avery. (Furniss, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
order
Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 12:50 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 3 admission requested by attorney Ryan M Furniss. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
attyadm
Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion
Thu 04/11 8:08 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ryan M Furniss. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-93619563 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 8:24 AM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ryan M Furniss. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9361956. Filed by Kevin Avery. (Furniss, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Tue 04/09 12:37 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/7/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/6/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 9/6/2024. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (le) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 2:33 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9359420 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kevin Avery against Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad. (Vitello, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |