Mondycp Corporation
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:24-bk-71379 |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 15, 2024 |
Debtor
Mondycp Corporation
1630 Arkansas Dr
Valley Stream, NY 11580-1806 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Robert Pryor
Pryor & Mandelup LLP 675 Old Country Road
Westbury, NY 11590 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 04/09/2024 12:02 AM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
utility
~Force Judge Assignment
Mon 04/08 2:05 PM
Judge Assigned Due to Prior Filing, Judge Reassigned. (jjf) |
||
court
Prior Filings
Mon 04/08 3:20 PM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 8 23-73999 ast Dismissed: 12/08/2023 (jjf) |
||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Mon 04/08 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $338.00. Receipt Number 10333285. (LS) (admin) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 04/08 2:03 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 338.00 Filed by Mondycp Corporation (jjf) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 No Asset) (Auto Assign)
Mon 04/08 2:05 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, Pryor, Robert with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 5/15/2024 at 09:00 AM at Zoom.us/join - Pryor: Meeting ID 661 772 3896, Passcode 8226103820, Phone 1 (516) |
|
4 | 4
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 7
Mon 04/08 3:24 PM
(DOCUMENT NOT ATTACHED -PLEASE DISREGARD; Notice Not Generated) Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/8/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/8/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/8/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/22/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/22/2024. Schedule D due 4/22/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/22/2024. Schedule G due 4/22/2024. Schedule H due 4/22/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/22/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/22/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/22/2024. (jjf) Modified on 4/8/2024 (jjf) |
|
5 | 5
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 7
Mon 04/08 3:56 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/8/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/8/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/8/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/22/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/22/2024. Schedule D due 4/22/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/22/2024. Schedule G due 4/22/2024. Schedule H due 4/22/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/22/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/22/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/22/2024. (jjf) |
|
6 | 6
court
Request for Notice - Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset
Mon 04/08 4:00 PM
Request for Notice - Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (jjf) |