Jaber v. Shroff et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Laura Taylor Swain |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02608 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Fri 04/12 9:02 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4-5. Mailed to: Faouzi Jaber ID:75840-054 FCI - Gilmer P.O. Box 6000 Glenville, WV 26351. (sha) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment
Thu 04/11 9:29 AM
CIVIL JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the April 9, 2024, order, this action is dismissed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/9/2024) (rro) |
|
Att: 1 Appeal Package | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Thu 04/11 9:28 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court dismisses Plaintiff's complaint without prejudice as duplicative of his pending case under docket number 24-CV-0932. The Court directs the Clerk of Court not to charge Plaintiff the $350.00 filing fee for this action. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Judgment shall enter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/9/2024) (rro) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) |
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Tue 04/09 9:03 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Authorization
Mon 04/08 4:01 PM
PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Fauzi Jaber..(rdz) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/08 4:00 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Fauzi Jaber..(rdz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Federal Defenders of New York, Inc., Sabrina Shroff. Document filed by Fauzi Jaber..(rdz) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 3:57 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |