GeneAllele LLC v. Oryzon Genomics, S.A.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John G Koeltl |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02663 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
Oryzon Genomics, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GeneAllele LLC
|
Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
minutes
~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 04/15 11:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/10/2024 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 04/12 12:56 PM
ORDER granting4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/12/2024) (ks) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 04/12 12:57 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Oryzon Genomics, S.A. answer due 5/15/2024. (ks) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/11 5:40 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time from April 15 to May 15, 2024, to respond to the Complaint, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Arantxa Cuadrado dated April 11, 2024. Document filed by Oryzon Genomics, S.A...(Cuadrado Perez-Broseta, Arantxa) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 10:54 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 10:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 10:54 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 6:34 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Oryzon Genomics, S.A...(Cuadrado Perez-Broseta, Arantxa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 6:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cuadrado Perez-Broseta, Arantxa) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/08 6:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 151761/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29190816).Document filed by Oryzon Genomics, S.A...(Cuadrado Perez-Broseta, Arantxa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service |