Chancy v. S&P Global Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Analisa Torres |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02665 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
S&P Global Inc.
55 Water Street
New York, NY 10041 |
|
Plaintiff
Sendy Chancy
23 Paul Place
Roosevelt, NY 11575 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Thu 04/11 12:25 PM
MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to File Document. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/11/2024) (va) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 9:09 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Victorelli on behalf of S&P Global Inc...(Victorelli, Laura) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 9:07 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diane Windholz on behalf of S&P Global Inc...(Windholz, Diane) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 04/10 4:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Complaint . Document filed by Sendy Chancy..(Mundaca, Francisco) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/10 4:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. S&P Global Inc. waiver sent on 4/9/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. Document filed by S&P Global Inc...(Windholz, Diane) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 1:35 PM
ORDER To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available oppo1tunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/10/2024) (jca) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 1:33 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Counsel for all pa1iies are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by June 7, 2024, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set fo1ih below. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are required to file a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination electronically on ECF, with a courtesy copy emailed to chambers in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/10/2024) (jca) |
|
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 1:30 PM
ORDER To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by June 7, 2024, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/10/2024) (jca) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Wed 04/10 2:07 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Francisco E Mundaca re: Document No. 3 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Court's leave has not been granted.. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 2:08 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Francisco E Mundaca to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the summons request was not processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/09 4:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to S&P Global, Inc., c/o Diane Windholz Wind, re:3 Complaint. Document filed by Sendy Chancy..(Mundaca, Francisco) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Washington on behalf of Sendy Chancy..(Washington, Melissa) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 12:41 PM
COMPLAINT against S&P Global Inc.. Document filed by Sendy Chancy..(Mundaca, Francisco) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-B | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Tue 04/09 11:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Francisco E Mundaca to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 11:54 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 11:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 11:54 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 9:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mundaca, Francisco) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 8:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Sendy Chancy. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29191325)Document filed by Sendy Chancy..(Mundaca, Francisco) |