Lindberg v. Pereira
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Becerra |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21308 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Greg E. Lindberg
|
|
Defendant
Michael Pereira
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning/Transferring Case - NEW District Judge
Wed 04/24 9:00 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Jacqueline Becerra for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 4/24/2024. Judge Roy K. Altman no longer assigned to case. We further ORDER and ADJUDGE that the Defendant's Motion for Intra-District Transfer ECF No.9 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Tue 04/23 4:34 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Michael Pereira(Bach, Sashi) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 04/22 6:18 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, , MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 5/6/2024.) by Michael Pereira.(Bach, Sashi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Pereira, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction | ||
15 | 15
notice
Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions
Mon 04/22 7:55 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the email information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Christopher David Sempier (pt) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/19 5:50 PM
STATUS REPORT by Michael Pereira(Bach, Sashi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael Pereira, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Appearance by Sashi Bach, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - State Court Action Records, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - State Court Action Docket | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name
Fri 04/19 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Christopher David Sempier (Sempier, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/18 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher David Sempier on behalf of Greg E. Lindberg. Attorney Christopher David Sempier added to party Greg E. Lindberg(pty:pla). (Sempier, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 4:27 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Michael Pereira (Bach, Sashi) |
|
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Sat 04/13 10:59 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 8 the Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall respond to the Complaint [ECF No. 1-3] by April 22, 2024 . Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/13/2024. (rco) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/12 3:59 PM
MOTION Motion for Intra-District Transfer by Michael Pereira. (Bach, Sashi) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 04/12 2:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, by Michael Pereira.(Bach, Sashi) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Fri 04/12 9:40 AM
ORDER Denying5 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions
Thu 04/11 6:18 PM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Michael Pereira (Bach, Sashi) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 04/11 10:30 AM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Michael Pereira. Responses due by 4/25/2024. (Bach, Sashi) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/09 4:42 PM
NOTICE Clarifying Plaintiff's Citizenship by Michael Pereira (Bach, Sashi) |
|
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Status Report Order
Tue 04/09 1:00 PM
ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT. ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/23/2024), ( Removal Status Report due by 4/19/2024.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/9/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 04/09 8:41 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Mon 04/08 9:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Injunctive Relief) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17431737, filed by Michael Pereira.(Singer, Stuart) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Declaration of Michael Pereira, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Composite State Court Case Filings, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - State Court Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Complaint in Damovo Financial Services, LLC, et al., v. McFarlane, et al., CACE-24-004495 (Part 1 of 4), | ||
Att: 8 Complaint in Damovo Financial Services, LLC, et al., v. McFarlane, et al., CACE-24-004495 (Part 2 of 4), | ||
Att: 9 Complaint in Damovo Financial Services, LLC, et al., v. McFarlane, et al., CACE-24-004495 (Part 3 of 4), | ||
Att: 10 Complaint in Damovo Financial Services, LLC, et al., v. McFarlane, et al., CACE-24-004495 (Part 4 of 4) |