Feltzin v. EQUITY ONE (FLORIDA PORTFOLIO) LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80430 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
EQUITY ONE (FLORIDA PORTFOLIO) LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Feltzin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 04/30 9:59 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Defendant shall file its response or answer by up to and including May 14, 2024. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (tfn) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 04/29 11:51 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Equity One (Florida Portfolio) LLC. Attorney Jonathan Eric Brody added to party Equity One (Florida Portfolio) LLC(pty:dft). (Brody, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Wed 04/24 4:59 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re4 Order of Requirements by Beverly Virues on behalf of Lawrence Feltzin (Virues, Beverly) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 3:49 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lawrence Feltzin identifying Other Affiliate Regency Centers, L.P., Other Affiliate Anthony Mattera for Lawrence Feltzin (Virues, Beverly) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/11 11:37 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Lawrence Feltzin. Equity One (Florida Portfolio) LLC served on 4/9/2024, response/answer due 4/30/2024. (Virues, Beverly) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Thu 04/11 9:42 AM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (jas) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Wed 04/10 3:04 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order of Requirements
Wed 04/10 3:01 PM
ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 9:09 AM
Summons Issued as to EQUITY ONE (FLORIDA PORTFOLIO) LLC. (pc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 04/09 9:06 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 6:53 PM
COMPLAINT against EQUITY ONE (FLORIDA PORTFOLIO) LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17431645, filed by Lawrence Feltzin.(Virues, Beverly) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |