Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Case #: 1:24-cv-01473
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1346(b) Inj or loss property, personal inj, death; US DFT
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2024
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 8:47 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Melaine A. Williams
contact info
Interested Party
Advanced Imaging Centers
Interested Party
Omni Healthcare
Interested Party
Phia Group
Plaintiff
Regene Logan McKinney
Represented By
Hunter G. Delashmit
The Delashmit Firm, LLC
contact info
Jacob Michael Jackson
Jackson Injury Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 02/19 9:57 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING31 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/19 9:58 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/12 9:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by United States of America. (Williams, Melaine)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
30 30 notice Notice to Take Deposition Fri 11/22 8:16 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Regene McKinney filed by United States of America (Williams, Melaine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
29 29 notice Notice to Take Deposition Thu 11/21 5:36 PM
Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Leander Malachi White filed by Regene Logan McKinney (Delashmit, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 11/14 3:33 PM
ORDER granting27 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 1/30/2025. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/14/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 11/14 11:43 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by United States of America.(Williams, Melaine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 18, 2024
26 26 order Protective Order Fri 10/18 11:06 AM
PRIVACY ACT PROTECTIVE ORDER. See Order for specifics. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/18/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
25 25 motion Protective Order Thu 10/17 10:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order with Brief In Support by United States of America.(Williams, Melaine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Thu 10/17 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production, and Request to Admit by United States of America.(Williams, Melaine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
23 23 discov Certificate of Service Wed 10/09 8:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff Response to United States of America First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Request for the Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Regene Logan McKinney.(Delashmit, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
22 22 notice Notice to Take Deposition Wed 10/02 6:33 PM
First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Leander Malachi White filed by Regene Logan McKinney (Delashmit, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
21 21 notice Notice to Take Deposition Tue 09/24 10:14 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Regene Logan McKinney filed by United States of America (Williams, Melaine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
20 20 discov Certificate of Service Tue 09/03 4:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate of Service - Plaintiff First Amended Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Request for the Production of Documents to Defendant by Regene Logan McKinney.(Delashmit, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
19 19 discov Certificate of Service Thu 08/22 10:21 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production, and Request to Admit to Plaintiff by United States of America.(Williams, Melaine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
18 18 discov Certificate of Service Wed 08/21 3:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Requst for Admissions, Interrogatories and Request for the Production of Documents to Defendant by Regene Logan McKinney.(Delashmit, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 07/30 10:41 AM
Clerk's Notation re15 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/22 2:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:14 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 11/14/2024. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/22/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
16 16 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 07/17 9:33 PM
Initial Disclosures by Regene Logan McKinney.(Delashmit, Hunter)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/17 9:27 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regene Logan McKinney. (Delashmit, Hunter)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 07/17 9:16 PM
Joint JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Regene Logan McKinney. (Delashmit, Hunter)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 07/17 4:19 PM
Initial Disclosures by United States of America.(Williams, Melaine)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/17 7:06 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by United States of America. Discovery ends on 11/14/2024.(Williams, Melaine)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
11 11 misc Leave of Absence Fri 05/17 3:59 PM
Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 16, 2024 through May 28, 2024, by Melaine A. Williams. (Williams, Melaine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
10 10 service Certificate of Service Thu 05/02 5:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Regene Logan McKinney Certificate of Compliance(Jackson, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Non Service - United States of America,
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - United States of America,
Att: 3 Exhibit Service on United States of America - Fedex and USPS Delivery Confirmations
Monday, April 22, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Mon 04/22 4:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet for United States of America , as to Ryan K. Buchanan, Esq.. (Jackson, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 04/12 10:01 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to United States of America. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
7 7 service Proposed Summons Thu 04/11 12:27 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Regene Logan McKinney Summons - United States - DC (Jackson, Jacob)
Related: [-]
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Thu 04/11 11:03 AM
STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/11/24. (lme)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 04/11 9:12 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to United States of America. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
4 4 service Proposed Summons Tue 04/09 11:44 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Regene Logan McKinney Amended Summons - United States of America (Jackson, Jacob)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Tue 04/09 10:56 AM
NOTICE Of Filing Complaint by Regene Logan McKinney re1 Complaint, Complaint Exhibit (Jackson, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
2 2 service Proposed Summons Mon 04/08 5:00 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Regene Logan McKinney Summons - United States of America (Jackson, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/08 12:43 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Regene Logan McKinney. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13343338) -Summons not issued because multiple addresses were listed for Defendant. Attorney contacted to refile. (bmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet