Mostafa v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Amy Totenberg |
Referred: | Christopher C Bly |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01480 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (other) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Prisons
|
|
Defendant
Lieutenant Shantrell Humes
|
|
Plaintiff
Vernon Hassan Mostafa
161 Plantation Drive
Fayetteville, GA 30215 |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing
Thu 05/02 2:10 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Second Updated Amended Settlement by Vernon Hassan Mostafa. (dob) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/26 4:38 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (hfm) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 04/24 4:42 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Additional Exhibit I by Vernon Hassan Mostafa. (dob) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing
Tue 04/16 3:37 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Amended Additional Exhibit A by Vernon Hassan Mostafa. (dob) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 04/15 2:17 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Amended Settlement Request by Vernon Hassan Mostafa. (dob) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/08 3:23 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vernon Hassan Mostafa.(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/08 3:26 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (bmr) |