HT Sweetwater Property Owner, LP v. Stephen
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Victoria M Calvert |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01485 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nashitah Stephen
and all other occupants 1905 Riverside parkway Apt. 510
Douglasville, GA 30135 |
|
Plaintiff
HT Sweetwater Property Owner, LP
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response (Non-Motion)
Tue 04/23 3:56 PM
RESPONSE re5 Order on Motion to Stay, filed by Nashitah Stephen. (ajw) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Fri 04/12 10:40 AM
Remand Letter to the Clerk of Court of the Magistrate Court of Douglas County. (jbu) |
|
utility
Remark
Fri 04/12 10:47 AM
Case remanded to Magistrate Court of Douglas County per5 Order. Certified copy of remand order and copy of remand letter sent through USPS. (jbu) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/12 10:48 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nashitah Stephen re5 Order. (jbu) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 04/12 10:25 AM
ORDER: Defendant's4 Emergency Motion to Stay Writ of Possession is DENIED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Douglas County. There being no further issues before the Court, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 4/11/2024. (jbu) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 04/12 10:30 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jbu) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stay
Wed 04/10 12:23 PM
Emergency MOTION to Stay Writ of Possession by Nashitah Stephen. (jbu) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Nashitah Stephen.(jbu) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 12:17 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 4/10/2024. c:Financial Office(jbu) |
|
utility
Submission to District Judge
Wed 04/10 12:26 PM
Submission of3 Notice of Removal for frivolity determination to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (jbu) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 04/10 12:26 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nashitah Stephen re2 Order. (jbu) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/08 4:23 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nashitah Stephen.(ajw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/08 4:25 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (ajw) |