Riley v. Carrier Corporation et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | George A Otoole, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10907 |
Nature of Suit | 368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
York International Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warren Pumps, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Viking Pump, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Velan Valve Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Valves & Controls US, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The William Powell Company
|
|
Defendant
Straham Valves, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Spirax Sarco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Robertshaw Controls Company, individually and as successor-in-interest to Fulton Sylphon Company
|
|
Defendant
Redco Corporation f/k/a Crane Co.
|
|
Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
MetLife, Inc. 200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166 |
|
Defendant
Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.
|
|
Defendant
ITT LLC
|
|
Defendant
IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company
|
|
Defendant
Goulds Pumps LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gardner Denver, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Flowserve US, Inc. as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Co., Edward Valves, Inc. and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
FMC Corporation
Boston, MA 02199
|
|
Defendant
Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
18013 Cleveland Parkway Suite 100
Cleveland, OH 44135 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles J McAtamney
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
46 | 46
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (DeLuzio, Maria) |
|
45 | 45
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Perritano, Judith) |
|
44 | 44
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Riordan, Meghan) |
|
43 | 43
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Mon 04/29 2:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM , and Response to Cross-Claims against Straham Valves, Inc. by Straham Valves, Inc..(Batchelder, Stephanie) |
|
42 | 42
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 2:05 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Straham Valves, Inc.. (Batchelder, Stephanie) |
|
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Batchelder on behalf of Straham Valves, Inc. (Batchelder, Stephanie) |
|
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of The William Powell Company (Riordan, Meghan) |
|
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan) |
|
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan) |
|
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of The William Powell Company (Perritano, Judith) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Perritano, Judith) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Perritano, Judith) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Perritano, Judith) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Perritano, Judith) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of The William Powell Company (DeLuzio, Maria) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria) |
|
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/29 11:34 AM
ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by Goulds Pumps LLC.(George, Wayne) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 11:32 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco, Inc., Other Affiliate InTelCo Management LLC for Goulds Pumps LLC.. (George, Wayne) |
|
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/29 11:29 AM
ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by Carrier Corporation.(George, Wayne) |
|
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/29 11:24 AM
ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by York International Corporation.(George, Wayne) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 11:22 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation.. (George, Wayne) |
|
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/29 11:15 AM
ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by ITT LLC.(George, Wayne) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 11:14 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ITT LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco, Inc., Other Affiliate InTelCo Management LLC for ITT LLC.. (George, Wayne) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of ITT LLC (George, Wayne) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Simon on behalf of Goulds Pumps LLC, ITT LLC, York International Corporation (Simon, Julia) |
|
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sat 04/27 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Defendants' Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/25 9:22 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. (Felice, John) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/25 9:19 AM
Acknowledgment of Service and Adoption of Model Cross-Claim and Affirmative Defenses in Lieu of ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp..(Felice, John) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brad W. Graham on behalf of Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp. (Graham, Brad) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp. (Felice, John) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
State Court Record - no answer filed in state court
Wed 04/17 7:37 PM
STATE COURT Record. (George, Wayne) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Tue 04/09 10:47 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 04/09 10:15 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 04/08 7:15 PM
NOTICE by York International Corporation re1 Notice of Removal, York International Corporation's Joinder in Carrier Corporation's Notice of Removal(George, Wayne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 7:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of York International Corporation (George, Wayne) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 04/08 6:48 PM
NOTICE by Goulds Pumps LLC re1 Notice of Removal, Goulds Pumps LLC's Joinder in Defendant Carrier Corporation's Notice of Removal(George, Wayne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Errata B | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of Goulds Pumps LLC (George, Wayne) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 6:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carrier Corporation. (George, Wayne) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 6:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of Carrier Corporation (George, Wayne) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 6:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Simon on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Simon, Julia) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/08 6:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrier Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10356333 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Simon, Julia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Filing Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Category Form |