Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Margaret R Guzman
Case #: 4:24-cv-40053
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Terminated:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 11:21 AM EDT
Defendant
The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Nathan P. Lusignan
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Ian H. Morrison
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Sara E. Sweeney
Seyfarth Shaw
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Kilroy
Represented By
George M. Thompson, Jr.
The Law Office Of George Thompson
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, August 12, 2024
16 16 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Mon 08/12 1:51 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 08/12 9:51 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice) by The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. (Lusignan, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 07/29 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint Notice of Settlement And Request For Stay) by The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America (Lusignan, Nathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice Cancelling Hearing Mon 07/29 2:49 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Scheduling Conference. (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/16 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ian H. Morrison on behalf of The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America (Morrison, Ian)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/16 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan P. Lusignan on behalf of The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America (Lusignan, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Mon 07/01 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester Related [+] before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-] mote only
Friday, June 14, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 06/14 10:27 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ian Morrison and Nathan Lusignan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Barrows, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/13 6:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America.(Sweeney, Sara)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/13 6:05 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. (Sweeney, Sara)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/13 6:04 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ian Morrison and Nathan Lusignan Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number AMADC-10464182 by The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America.(Sweeney, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of S. Sweeney,
Att: 2 Declaration of I. Morrison,
Att: 3 Declaration of N. Lusignan
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 5:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara E. Sweeney on behalf of The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America (Sweeney, Sara)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/03 7:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mary Kilroy. The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Thompson, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 04/09 1:24 PM
Summons Issued as to The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 04/09 1:23 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/08 9:19 PM
COMPLAINT against The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10356413 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Mary Kilroy.(Thompson, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form