Mulder v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Iowa Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen H Locher |
Referred: | William P Kelly |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00128 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 3:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vantage Mobility International LLC
5202 S. 28th Place
Phoenix, AZ 85040 |
|
Plaintiff
Mary Joy Mulder
1612 3rd Street
Hull, IA 51239 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 04/09 2:07 PM
TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 5/14/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 1-877-411-9748 and enter code 1376500 to be connected to the call. The parties shall file a Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan as provided by Local Rule 16 by 5/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 4/9/2024. (djs) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/09 11:51 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..(Jacobson, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 04/09 11:27 AM
NOTICE by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. of Local Rule 81 Compliance . (Jacobson, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Errata
Tue 04/09 11:01 AM
Errata re1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Jacobson, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet
Tue 04/09 9:38 AM
Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 4/30/2024. (nla) |
|
Att: 1 7.1 Packet | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT
Mon 04/08 6:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Jacobson, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/08 5:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL158123. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 405, receipt number AIASDC-5426530., filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/8/2024.(Jacobson, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Service of Process, Original Notice and Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Purchase Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit TMS Business Record, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Vantage Mobility LLC Business Record |