Wilson v. Family Dollar, Inc. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah S Vance |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00881 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 3:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
Family Dollar Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Family Dollar Stores of Louisiana, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Family Dollar, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/30 9:28 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Family Dollar Services, LLC, Family Dollar Stores of Louisiana, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc..Attorney Jack Etherton Truitt added to party Family Dollar Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jack Etherton Truitt added to party Family Dollar Stores of Louisiana, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jack Etherton Truitt added to party Family Dollar, Inc.(pty:dft).(Truitt, Jack) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 2:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Family Dollar Services, LLC, Family Dollar Stores of Louisiana, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc.(cs) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 04/09 9:30 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (kls) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 7:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10475996) filed by Cynthia Wilson.Attorney Matthew Donald Hemmer added to party Cynthia Wilson(pty:pla).(Hemmer, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons As to Family Dollar Inc, | ||
Att: 3 Summons As to Family Dollar Services LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Summons As to Family Dollar Stores of Louisiana LLC |