New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00239
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
DAVID WINTERMUTE (1)
Represented By
BENJAMIN JON WEST
The Office Of The Federal Defencer For The District Of Nj
contact info
JONATHAN F. MARSHALL
Law Office Of Jonathan Marshall
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
ALEXANDER EDWARD RAMEY
United States Attorney'S Office For The District Of New
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/09/2024 3:35 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT as to DAVID WINTERMUTE (1). (kas) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. (kas) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order to Seal Case as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/20/2021. (kas) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Arrest of DAVID WINTERMUTE (kas) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Initial Appearance as to DAVID WINTERMUTE held on 4/21/2021. All parties consent to pretrial release. Ordered bail set at $250,000.00 unsecured bond. Order Setting Conditions of Release to follow. (Digitally Recorded.) (kas) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. BENJAMIN JON WEST for DAVID WINTERMUTE appointed for purposes of initial appearance only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/21/2021. (kas) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by DAVID WINTERMUTE (kas) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER regarding use of video conference as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/21/2021. (kas) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to DAVID WINTERMUTE (1) $250,000.00 unsecured bond (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/21/2021. (kas) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
10 10 Appearance Bond Entered as to DAVID WINTERMUTE in amount of $ 250,000.00, (kas) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
Case unsealed as to DAVID WINTERMUTE (kas, ) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
11 11 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JONATHAN F. MARSHALL for DAVID WINTERMUTE added. Attorney BENJAMIN JON WEST terminated. (MARSHALL, JONATHAN) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
12 12 ORDER TO CONTINUE as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. Time excluded from 4/29/2021 until 7/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/29/2021. (jem) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
13 13 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Z. N. Quraishi no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/30/2021. (dm ) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. Time excluded from 7/20/2021 until 10/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/20/2021. (jem) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
15 15 ORDER TO CONTINUE as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. Time excluded from 10/25/2021 until 1/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/25/2021. (jem) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
16 16 ORDER TO CONTINUE as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. Time excluded from 1/20/2022 until 4/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/20/2022. (jem) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
17 17 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAVID WINTERMUTE - Time excluded from 4/29/2022 until 7/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 4/29/2022. (abr, ) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
18 18 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAVID WINTERMUTE Time excluded from 7/26/2022 until 10/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/26/2022. (jdg) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
19 19 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAVID WINTERMUTE Time excluded from 11/3/2022 until 1/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/3/2022. (mg, ) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
20 20 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAVID WINTERMUTE Time excluded from 1/19/2023 until 3/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/19/2023. (jal, ) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
21 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE ALEXANDER EDWARD RAMEY appearing for USA. Attorney CHRISTOPHER D. MATTHEWS terminated. (RAMEY, ALEXANDER) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
22 22 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAVID WINTERMUTE Time excluded from 3/30/2023 until 5/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/30/2023. (jal, ) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
23 23 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/30/2023. (gxh) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
24 24 ORDER TO CONTINUE as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. Time excluded from 5/31/2023 until 8/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/31/2023. (jem) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
25 25 ORDER TO CONTINUE as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. Time excluded from 8/30/2023 until 10/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/30/2023. (jem) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
26 26 ORDER TO CONTINUE as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. Time excluded from 10/31/2023 until 1/02/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/31/2023. (jem) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
27 27 3 pgs ORDER TO CONTINUE as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. Time excluded from 12/21/2023 until 2/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/21/2023. (jem) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
28 28 3 pgs ORDER TO CONTINUE as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. Time excluded from 2/29/2024 until 5/01/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/29/2024. (jem) [3:21-mj-14008-TJB]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
29 29 INFORMATION as to DAVID WINTERMUTE (1) count 1. (kas)
Related: [-]
30 30 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by DAVID WINTERMUTE (kas, )
Related: [-]
31 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi:Initial Appearance and Plea Agreement Hearing as to DAVID WINTERMUTE held on 4/8/2024. Plea entered by DAVID WINTERMUTE (1) Guilty Count 1. Sentencing set for 8/27/2024 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4W before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. (Court Reporter Megan McKay-Soule (609-815-2319) (kas) (Entered: 04/08/2024)
Related: [-]
32 32 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to DAVID WINTERMUTE. (kas, )
Related: [-]
33 33 12 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to DAVID WINTERMUTE (kas)
Related: [-]